Alexander, Ricky v. Dodge Correctional Institution
Plaintiff: Ricky N. Alexander
Defendant: Dodge Correctional Institution
Case Number: 3:2014cv00849
Filed: December 9, 2014
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Wisconsin
Office: Madison Office
County: Grant
Presiding Judge: Stephen L. Crocker
Presiding Judge: James D. Peterson
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
October 6, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 81 ORDER on ifp request: Trust Fund Account Statement due 10/27/2017. Signed by Magistrate Judge Peter A. Oppeneer on 10/6/2017. (jef),(ps)
August 24, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 71 ORDER denying plaintiff's 66 Motion for Reconsideration and denying plaintiff's 65 Motion to deny counsel's request to depose plaintiff. Signed by District Judge James D. Peterson on 8/24/2017. (elc),(ps)
March 13, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 64 JUDGMENT entered in favor of defendants dismissing this case. Signed by Peter A. Oppeneer, Clerk of Court on 3/13/2017. (jef),(ps)
May 25, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 32 ORDER denying 31 Motion to Reassign Case. Plaintiff may have until June 15, 2016, to file an amended complaint. Signed by District Judge James D. Peterson on 5/25/2016. (jef),(ps)
April 28, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 30 ORDER granting in part 27 motion for reconsideration. The judgment entered in this case, Dkt. 11 , is VACATED, and the strike recorded against plaintiff pursuant to 28 U.S.C. § 1915(g) is RESCINDED. Plaintiff may have until May 19, 2016, to file an amended complaint against the defendants who discriminated against him. Signed by District Judge James D. Peterson on 4/28/2016. (jef),(ps)
March 4, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ORDER denying 25 motion to deem the district court decision as void and request for recusal. Signed by District Judge James D. Peterson on 3/3/2016. (jef),(ps)
January 19, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER denying plaintiff's 22 , 23 Motion for Assistance in Recruiting Counsel. Signed by District Judge James D. Peterson on 1/19/2016. (jef),(ps)
December 22, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER denying plaintiff's 18 Motion for Reconsideration. Signed by District Judge James D. Peterson on 12/22/2015. (jef),(ps)
June 2, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 11 JUDGMENT entered denying plaintiff leave to proceed and dismissing this case for failure to state a claim upon which relief can be granted. (PAO/jef). (jef),(ps)
December 23, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER Assessing Initial partial filing fee of $ 52.69. Initial partial filing fee due 1/12/2015. Signed by Magistrate Judge Peter A. Oppeneer on 12/23/2014. (elc),(ps)
December 15, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER on ifp request: Plaintiff to submit Trust fund account statement. Trust Fund Account Statement due 1/5/2015. Signed by Magistrate Judge Peter A. Oppeneer on 12/15/2014. (jef),(ps)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Wisconsin Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Alexander, Ricky v. Dodge Correctional Institution
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ricky N. Alexander
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dodge Correctional Institution
Represented By: Corey Francis Finkelmeyer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?