April 17, 2017 |
Filing
180
ORDER denying plaintiff's 175 motion to alter or amend the judgment. Signed by District Judge James D. Peterson on 4/17/2017. (jef),(ps)
|
February 2, 2017 |
Filing
172
JUDGMENT entered in favor of defendants dismissing the case. Signed by Peter A. Oppeneer, Clerk of Court on 2/2/2017. (jef),(ps)
|
January 31, 2017 |
Filing
169
ORDER denying 121 Motion for Reconsideration; denying as moot 145 Motion to amend the scheduling order; granting 154 Motion for Summary Judgment; denying 168 Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings. Plaintiff's state-law assault claims against defendants Pichler, Schauf, and Labroscian are DISMISSED without prejudice for plaintiff's failure to comply with Wisconsin's notice-of-claim statute. Defendant Burch may have until February 6, 2017, to respond to this order r egarding whether he wishes to continue prosecuting his motion to dismiss for lack of proper service. The trial date and associated pretrial submission deadlines are STRICKEN. Signed by District Judge James D. Peterson on 1/31/2017. (jef),(ps)
|
October 6, 2016 |
Filing
161
ORDER that plaintiff Leonard John Sundsmo may have until October 31, 2016, to submit his brief opposing defendant Derek Burch's motion for summary judgment, along with plaintiff's responses to Burch's proposed finding of fact, plaintiff's own proposed findings, and evidentiary materials supporting those findings. (2) Defendant Burch may have until November 10, 2016, to file his reply materials. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker on 10/6/2016. (jef),(ps)
|
March 14, 2016 |
Filing
117
ORDER denying 100 motion for recusal; granting 84 Motion for Summary Judgment; granting in part and denying in part 93 Motion to Dismiss. Defendants Leon and Calkins are DISMISSED from the case. Plaintiff's claims against Burch for violat ion of the Fourth Amendment in entering Angela Mazerek's residence and in the fact that plaintiff was arrested are DISMISSED. Any state-law claims plaintiff brought against Burch are also DISMISSED. Plaintiff's claims against defendants R yan Labroscian, Mike Pichler, and Mark Schauf for violation of the Fourth Amendment in entering Angela Mazerek's residence and in the fact that plaintiff was arrested are DISMISSED. Plaintiff may have until April 4, 2016, to submit a declaration from Jon Micheal Kutz explaining, under penalty of perjury, precisely how he served defendant Burch. Signed by District Judge James D. Peterson on 3/14/2016. (jef),(ps)
|
June 2, 2015 |
Filing
83
ORDER that the motion for reconsideration submitted by plaintiff Leonard John Sundsmo, Dkt. 77 , is STRICKEN because it has not been properly signed by plaintiff. Signed by District Judge James D. Peterson on 6/2/2015. (jef),(ps)
|
April 15, 2015 |
Filing
76
ORDER that:1.  Plaintiff Leonard John Sundsmo's motion for temporary restraining order, Dkt. 5 , is DENIED.2.  Plaintiff's motion for recusal, Dkt. 61 , is DENIED.3.  Plaintiff's second motion for preliminary injunctive relief, Dkt. 27 , is DENIED.4.  Plaintiff's motions for entry of default, Dkt. 2 9, 31 , 33 , 35 , 37 , 39 , and motions for default judgment, Dkt. 43 , 45 , 47 , 49 , 51 , 53 , are DENIED.5.  Defendants 039; motions to strike documents submitted by plaintiff's father, Dkt. 41 , 55 , 57 are DENIED as moot.6.  Plaintiff's motion for leave to file an amended complaint, Dkt. 66 , is DENIED. The case will proceed with the original complaint as the operative complaint. Defendants' motion to strike the complaint, Dkt. 73 , is DENIED as moot.7.  The clerk of court is directed to schedule a preliminary pretrial conference for this case.8.   The motion to dismi ss filed by Sergei Smirenski, a defendant newly named in plaintiff's proposed amended complaint, Dkt. 70 , is DENIED as moot.9.   Any summonses issued to the newly named defendants in plaintiff's proposed amended complaint are QUASHED. None of these parties are required to file a response to the complaint. Signed by District Judge James D. Peterson on 4/15/2015. (nln),(ps)
|