Connelly, Timothy et al v. Dan Lepke Trucking LLC et al
Plaintiff: |
Timothy Connelly and David Winchell |
Defendant: |
Dan Lepke Trucking LLC, Lepke Trucking & Excavating LLC and Daniel Lepke |
Case Number: |
3:2015cv00308 |
Filed: |
May 21, 2015 |
Court: |
US District Court for the Western District of Wisconsin |
Office: |
Madison Office |
County: |
Dane |
Presiding Judge: |
Stephen L. Crocker |
Presiding Judge: |
James D. Peterson |
Nature of Suit: |
Fair Labor Standards Act |
Cause of Action: |
29 U.S.C. § 201 |
Jury Demanded By: |
None |
Available Case Documents
The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed |
Document Text |
October 16, 2019 |
Filing
195
JUDGMENT in favor of Timothy Connelly against Dan Lepke Trucking LLC, Lepke Trucking & Excavating LLC in the amount of $8,276.00. (kwf)
|
May 16, 2018 |
Filing
187
ORDER denying without prejudice 167 Motion for Summary Judgment by Plaintiffs Timothy Connelly, David Winchell. This case is STAYED pending a decision in Bakkestuen v. Lepke Holdings LLC, No. 2017AP2500 (Wis. Ct. App.). Signed by District Judge James D. Peterson on 5/16/2018. (arw)
|
March 30, 2018 |
Filing
172
OPINION & ORDER denying 128 Motion to Certify Class under Rule 23. Plaintiffs may have until April 6, 2018, to inform the court whether they want an opportunity to join more plaintiffs. Until then, briefing on plaintiffs' motion for summary judgment, Dkt. 167 , is STAYED. Signed by District Judge James D. Peterson on 3/30/2018. (kwf)
|
January 6, 2017 |
Filing
102
OPINION & ORDER denying 75 Motion for Summary Judgment; denying as moot 95 Motion to Strike Declarations and New Arguments; granting 100 Motion for Leave to File Response to Plaintiffs' Contention That The Court Should Disregard the Daniel Lepke Declaration. Plaintiffs' claims against defendant Daniel Lepke are DISMISSED, pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 25. The court will hold a telephonic status conference to reset all remaining deadlines in this case on Friday, January 13, 2017, at 10:00 a.m., before Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker. Plaintiffs' counsel is responsible for setting up the call to chambers at (608) 264-5153. Signed by District Judge James D. Peterson on 1/6/2017. (kwf)
|
April 21, 2016 |
Filing
70
OPINION and ORDER granting 62 Motion to Re-Sequence Deadlines for Pretrial Motions. Defendants' motion regarding the motor carrier exemption will be due May 10, 2016; plaintiffs' response will be due May 31, 2016; and defendants' reply will be due June 10, 2016. The court will rule on the stayed aspect of plaintiffs' motion to compel, Dkt. 30 , and reset all remaining deadlines, including the deadline for dispositive motions and plaintiffs' motion for class certification, if necessary, after it resolves the motor carrier exemption issue. Signed by District Judge James D. Peterson on 4/21/2016. (kwf)
|
Access additional case information on PACER
Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system.
A subscription to PACER is required.
Access this case on the Wisconsin Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System
Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.
Why Is My Information Online?