United States of America v. Spectrum Brands, Inc.

Plaintiff: United States of America
Defendant: Spectrum Brands, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2015cv00371
Filed: June 17, 2015
Court: Wisconsin Western District Court
Office: Madison Office
County: Dane
Presiding Judge: Stephen L. Crocker
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
April 9, 2018 263 Opinion or Order of the Court AMENDED JUDGMENT in favor of United States of America against Spectrum Brands, Inc. (WMC/PAO) (voc)
March 5, 2018 259 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER re: 3/5/2018 Telephone Conference regarding the Seventh Circuit's mandate and remand to modify the permanent injunction consistent with this court's January 19, 2018 opinion (dkt. # 256 ). Signed by District Judge William M. Conley on 3/5/2018. (voc)
January 19, 2018 256 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER amending permanent injunction, granting in part and denying in part 236 Motion to Stay Pending Appeal. Signed by District Judge William M. Conley on 1/19/2018. (arw)
November 13, 2017 243 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting in part and denying in part 236 Motion to Stay Pending Appeal by Defendant Spectrum Brands, Inc. Signed by District Judge William M. Conley on 11/13/2017. (voc)
October 25, 2017 238 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER re 236 Motion to Stay Pending Appeal filed by Spectrum Brands, Inc. Signed by District Judge William M. Conley on 10/25/2017. (voc)
October 3, 2017 235 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT in favor of United States of America against Spectrum Brands, Inc. in the amount of $1,936,675.00. (WMC /PAO) (voc)
September 29, 2017 234 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER accepting 216 Joint Stipulation Regarding Exhibits ; granting 230 Motion to proffer additional testimony; and entering a civil penalty and permanent injunction. Signed by District Judge William M. Conley on 09/29/2017. (mfh)
February 21, 2017 228 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER on Deposition Designations. Signed by District Judge William M. Conley on 2/21/2017. (voc)
February 15, 2017 217 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER on the parties' objections to witnesses and exhibits. The court will review all expert narratives and written reports in advance of the civil penalty hearing on 2/21/2017. Experts need only appear in person if the other side wants to cross -examine them before the court. By 4:30 PM on 2/17/2017, both sides should indicate which opposing experts they want to appear in person. The parties shall also provide a final list of their witnesses who will appear in person to testif y. The court will hold a telephonic conference with the parties at 3:00 PM on Thursday, 2/16/2017, to address any part of this order or other housekeeping matters that remain. The parties shall provide to the court on the morning of the evidentiary hearing an electronic or hard copy of all exhibits that have been stipulated to or will be offered into evidence. Signed by District Judge William M. Conley on 2/15/2017. (arw)
November 17, 2016 196 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting plaintiff's motion for summary judgment as to defendant's liability on Count I; denying defendant's motions for summary judgment; denying defendant's motion to dismiss. Signed by District Judge William M. Conley on 11/17/2016. (krc)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Wisconsin Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: United States of America v. Spectrum Brands, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: United States of America
Represented By: Alan Phelps
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Spectrum Brands, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?