Whitford, William et al v. Nichol, Gerald et al Featured Case
Plaintiff: William Whitford, Roger Anclam, Emily Bunting, Mary Lynn Donohue, Helen Harris, Wayne Jensen, Wendy Sue Johnson, Janet Mitchell, Allison Seaton, James Seaton, Jerome Wallace and Donald Winter
Defendant: Gerald C. Nichol, Thomas Barland, John Franke, Harold V. Froehlich, Kevin J. Kennedy, Elsa Lamelas and Timothy Vocke
Case Number: 3:2015cv00421
Filed: July 8, 2015
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Wisconsin
Office: Madison Office
County: Dane
Presiding Judge: Barbara B. Crabb
Presiding Judge: Stephen L. Crocker
Nature of Suit: State Reapportionment
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
August 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 347 ORDER: It is ordered that the Assembly's motion for attorney's fees, Dkt. 326 , is denied. The WEC and the Assembly's requests for an award of costs, Dkt. 328 and Dkt. 330 , are denied. Signed by Judges Kenneth F. Ripple, William C. Griesbach and James D. Peterson on 8/22/2019. (voc)
July 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 319 JUDGMENT dismissing this case without prejudice for lack of jurisdiction. (voc)
July 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 318 ORDER granting 316 Plaintiffs' Motion to Dismiss the case without prejudice; Denying 317 Defendants' motion to dismiss the case with prejudice. Signed by Judges Kenneth F. Ripple, William C. Griesbach and James D. Peterson on 7/2/2019. (voc)
June 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 306 ORDER denying 282 Motion to Strike Plaintiffs' Supplemental Disclosures by Intervenor Defendant Wisconsin State Assembly. Signed by Judges Kenneth F. Ripple, William C. Griesbach and James D. Peterson 6/21/2019. (voc)
May 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 280 ORDER denying 276 Motion to Stay by Third Party Defendant Robin J. Vos. Signed by Judges Kenneth F. Ripple, William C. Griesbach and James D. Peterson on 5/13/2019. (voc)
May 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 275 ORDER: It is ordered that plaintiffs' motion to compel discovery, Dkt. 257 , is granted as to the deposition of Robin Vos and requests for production nos. 1-3, 6-9, and 15. The motion is otherwise denied. Signed by Judges Kenneth F. Ripple, William C. Griesbach and James D. Peterson on 5/3/2019. (voc)
January 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 243 ORDER denying without prejudice 224 Motion to Dismiss and 27 Motion to Dismiss; granting in part and denying in part 230 Motion to Stay. Signed by Judges William C. Griesbach, James D. Peterson and Kenneth F. Ripple on 1/23/2019. Associated Cases: 3:15-cv-00421-jdp, 3:18-cv-00763-jdp. (voc)
November 13, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 223 ORDER granting Wisconsin State Assembly's 209 Motion to Intervene; setting deadlines on the Assembly's motions to dismiss. Signed by Judges Kenneth F. Ripple, William C. Griesbach and James D. Peterson on 11/13/2018. (jls)
October 5, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 212 ORDER that the motion filed by the Wisconsin Assembly Democratic Campaign Committee to consolidate No. 18-cv-763-jdp with No. 15-cv-421-jdp is GRANTED for the limited purpose of scheduling. After the October 16, 2018 preliminary pretrial conference, the court will revisit the issue of consolidation if it becomes apparent that individual issues predominate or if consolidation is otherwise impractical. The committee may have until to October 10, 2018, to file any objections to the joint preliminary pretrial report submitted by the parties in No. 15-cv-421-jdp. Signed by Judges Kenneth F. Ripple, William C. Griesbach and James D. Peterson on 10/5/2018. (voc)
August 16, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 199 ORDER accepting in part 198 Status Report (Joint Memorandum Stating the Parties' Positions on Further Proceedings). It is Ordered that: 1. The August 17 and 27 memoranda deadlines are struck. 2. Plaintiffs have until September 14, 2018, to file an amended complaint. 3. The parties will update their initial disclosures by September 28. 4. Plaintiffs must serve any new expert reports by October 15. 5. The parties must submit a joint preliminary pretrial report by October 5, 2018. Signed by Judges Kenneth F. Ripple, William C. Griesbach and James D. Peterson on 8/16/2018. (voc)
August 2, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 197 ORDER of Withdrawal. District Judge Barbara B. Crabb withdrawn. Case randomly reassigned to District Judge James D. Peterson for all further proceedings. Signed by District Judge Barbara B. Crabb on 8/2/2018. (voc) Modified on 8/2/2018. (arw)
July 31, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 196 ORDER: Now that the United States Supreme Court has certified the judgment in this case, the court will provide the parties an opportunity to submit memoranda stating their position on further proceedings consistent with the opinion of the Court. Accordingly, IT IS ORDERED that the parties may have until August 17, 2018 in which to file and serve such memoranda. They may have until August 31, 2018 in which to file and serve reply memoranda. Signed by Judges Kenneth F. Ripple, Barbara B. Crabb and William C. Griesbach on 7/31/2018. (voc)
February 22, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 190 AMENDED JUDGMENT entered in favor of Plaintiffs Roger Anclam, Emily Bunting, Mary Lynne Donohue, Helen Harris, Wayne Jensen, Wendy Sue Johnson, Janet Mitchell, Allison Seaton, James Seaton, Jerome Wallace, William Whitford, Donald Winter dismissing the case. (voc)
January 27, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 183 JUDGMENT entered in favor of Plaintiffs Roger Anclam, Emily Bunting, Mary Lynn Donohue, Helen Harris, Wayne Jensen, Wendy Sue Johnson, Janet Mitchell, Allison Seaton, James Seaton, Jerome Wallace, William Whitford, Donald Winter dismissing the case. (voc)
November 21, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 166 OPINION and ORDER. Signed by Judges Kenneth F. Ripple, Barbara B. Crabb and William C. Griesbach. Signed by District Judge Barbara B. Crabb on 11/21/2016. (voc)
April 7, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 94 ORDER: IT IS ORDERED that The motion for summary judgment filed by defendants Gerald C. Nichol, Thomas Barland, John Franke, Harold V. Froehlich, Elsa Lamelas, Timothy Vocke and Kevin J. Kennedy, dkt. # 45 , is DENIED. The motion filed by plaint iffs William Whitford, Roger Anclam, Emily Bunting,Mary Lynne Donohue, Helen Harris, Wayne Jensen, Wendy Sue Johnson, Janet Mitchell, James Seaton, Allison Seaton, Jerome Wallace and Don Winter to exclude the opinions of Sean Trende, dkt. # 70 , is D ENIED WITHOUT PREJUDICE to plaintiffs' refiling it at the conclusion of trial. Trial will begin on Tuesday, May, 24, 2016 and should be completed by Friday, May 27, 2016. If the parties believe that is not a sufficient amount of time, they should explain their concerns in writing no later than April 18, 2016. Signed by Circuit Judge Kenneth F. Ripple, District Judge Barbara B. Crabb and District Judge William C. Griesbach on 4/7/2016. (voc)
December 17, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 43 ORDER denying 24 Motion to Dismiss by Defendants Thomas Barland, John Franke, Harold V. Froehlich, Kevin J. Kennedy, Elsa Lamelas, Gerald C. Nichol, Timothy Vocke. Signed by District Judge Barbara B. Crabb on 12/17/2015. (voc)
November 17, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 38 ORDER: Parties may have until November 23, 2015, to file supplemental, simultaneous briefs on the question of standing. They may have until November 30, 2015, to file responses to the other side's brief. Signed by District Judge Barbara B. Crabb, District Judge William C. Griesbach, and Circuit Judge Kenneth F. Ripple on 11/17/15. (jat)
September 29, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 30 ORDER appointing Circuit Judge Kenneth F. Ripple and Chief District Judge William C. Griesbach, of the Eastern District of Wisconsin, as additional members of the three-judge court. Signed by District Judge Diane P. Wood, Chief Judge USCA for the seventh circuit on 9/23/2015. (voc)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Wisconsin Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Whitford, William et al v. Nichol, Gerald et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: William Whitford
Represented By: Peter Guyon Earle
Represented By: Ruth Merewyn Greenwood
Represented By: Michele Louise Odorizzi
Represented By: Nicholas Odysseas Stephanopoulos
Represented By: Paul Strauss
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Roger Anclam
Represented By: Peter Guyon Earle
Represented By: Ruth Merewyn Greenwood
Represented By: Michele Louise Odorizzi
Represented By: Nicholas Odysseas Stephanopoulos
Represented By: Paul Strauss
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Emily Bunting
Represented By: Peter Guyon Earle
Represented By: Ruth Merewyn Greenwood
Represented By: Michele Louise Odorizzi
Represented By: Nicholas Odysseas Stephanopoulos
Represented By: Paul Strauss
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mary Lynn Donohue
Represented By: Peter Guyon Earle
Represented By: Ruth Merewyn Greenwood
Represented By: Michele Louise Odorizzi
Represented By: Nicholas Odysseas Stephanopoulos
Represented By: Paul Strauss
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Helen Harris
Represented By: Peter Guyon Earle
Represented By: Ruth Merewyn Greenwood
Represented By: Michele Louise Odorizzi
Represented By: Nicholas Odysseas Stephanopoulos
Represented By: Paul Strauss
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Wayne Jensen
Represented By: Peter Guyon Earle
Represented By: Ruth Merewyn Greenwood
Represented By: Michele Louise Odorizzi
Represented By: Nicholas Odysseas Stephanopoulos
Represented By: Paul Strauss
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Wendy Sue Johnson
Represented By: Peter Guyon Earle
Represented By: Ruth Merewyn Greenwood
Represented By: Michele Louise Odorizzi
Represented By: Nicholas Odysseas Stephanopoulos
Represented By: Paul Strauss
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Janet Mitchell
Represented By: Peter Guyon Earle
Represented By: Ruth Merewyn Greenwood
Represented By: Michele Louise Odorizzi
Represented By: Nicholas Odysseas Stephanopoulos
Represented By: Paul Strauss
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Allison Seaton
Represented By: Peter Guyon Earle
Represented By: Ruth Merewyn Greenwood
Represented By: Michele Louise Odorizzi
Represented By: Nicholas Odysseas Stephanopoulos
Represented By: Paul Strauss
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James Seaton
Represented By: Peter Guyon Earle
Represented By: Ruth Merewyn Greenwood
Represented By: Michele Louise Odorizzi
Represented By: Nicholas Odysseas Stephanopoulos
Represented By: Paul Strauss
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jerome Wallace
Represented By: Peter Guyon Earle
Represented By: Ruth Merewyn Greenwood
Represented By: Michele Louise Odorizzi
Represented By: Nicholas Odysseas Stephanopoulos
Represented By: Paul Strauss
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Donald Winter
Represented By: Peter Guyon Earle
Represented By: Ruth Merewyn Greenwood
Represented By: Michele Louise Odorizzi
Represented By: Nicholas Odysseas Stephanopoulos
Represented By: Paul Strauss
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gerald C. Nichol
Represented By: Brian P. Keenan
Represented By: Anthony David Russomanno
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Thomas Barland
Represented By: Brian P. Keenan
Represented By: Anthony David Russomanno
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Franke
Represented By: Brian P. Keenan
Represented By: Anthony David Russomanno
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Harold V. Froehlich
Represented By: Brian P. Keenan
Represented By: Anthony David Russomanno
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kevin J. Kennedy
Represented By: Brian P. Keenan
Represented By: Anthony David Russomanno
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Elsa Lamelas
Represented By: Brian P. Keenan
Represented By: Anthony David Russomanno
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Timothy Vocke
Represented By: Brian P. Keenan
Represented By: Anthony David Russomanno
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?