Dunn, Phillip v. Levine, Elliott et al
Plaintiff: Phillip S. Dunn
Defendant: Ronald Tischer, Ryan Secord, Andrew Dittman, Shawn Kudron, Dan Ulrich, Nathan Poke and City of La Crosse, Wisconsin
Case Number: 3:2015cv00430
Filed: July 9, 2015
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Wisconsin
Office: Madison Office
County: Jackson
Presiding Judge: Barbara B. Crabb
Presiding Judge: Stephen L. Crocker
Nature of Suit: Other Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
September 30, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 109 ORDER denying 101 Motion for New Trial; denying 102 Motion for Recusal. Signed by District Judge William M. Conley on 09/30/2017. (mfh),(ps)
December 9, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 94 JUDGMENT entered in favor of defendants dismissing this case. Signed by Peter A. Oppeneer, Clerk of Court on 12/9/2016. (jef),(ps)
December 7, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 91 ORDER that Audrey Perkins appear in person before this Court on Wednesday, December 21, 2016, at 12:30 p.m., at the Kastenmeier Federal Courthouse, 120 North Henry Street, Madison, in Courtroom 250 and show cause why she should not be held in contem pt of court for failing to remain or appear until called upon as required by the subpoena. In the alternative, Ms. Perkins may call the court at (608) 264-5087 before Monday, December 19, 2016, to explain her non-appearance. The United States Marshal Service will serve a copy of this Show Cause Order uponAudrey Perkins. Signed by District Judge William M. Conley on 12/7/2016. (jef),(ps)
November 28, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 77 ORDER denying without prejudice defendants' 67 Motion in Limine to preclude plaintiff Phillip Dunn from presenting evidence or making an argument about other lawsuits. Signed by District Judge Barbara B. Crabb on 11/28/2016. (jef),(ps)
November 15, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 74 ORDER granting defendants' 68 , 70 Motions for Issuance of Subpoenas. The clerk of court is directed to issue subpoena forms to defendants for John Addis and Audrey Perkins. Signed by District Judge Barbara B. Crabb on 11/15/2016. (jef),(ps)
September 21, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 57 ORDER granting in part and denying in part 31 Motion for Summary Judgment. Signed by District Judge Barbara B. Crabb on 9/21/2016. (elc),(ps)
June 14, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 47 ORDER that Phillip Dunn's motion to stay case no. 15-cv-430-bbc and 16-cv-224-bbc is DENIED. Dunn's alternative request to extend his summary judgment deadline to July 5, 2016, is GRANTED. The clerk of court is directed to UNSEAL Dunn's motion to stay. Signed by District Judge Barbara B. Crabb on 6/13/2016. (jef),(ps)
May 24, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 41 ORDER that the briefing schedule on the motion for summary judgment filed by defendants Ryan Secord, Shawn Kudron, Dan Ulrich and Nathan Poke is STAYED. Defendants may have until June 1, 2016, to attempt service again and report back to the court, after following the instructions in this order. If defendants do not respond by June 1, 2016, I will deny their summary judgment motion for lack of service. Signed by District Judge Barbara B. Crabb on 5/24/2016. (jef),(ps)
April 4, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER denying 19 motion for injunctive relief. Signed by District Judge Barbara B. Crabb on 4/4/2016. (jef),(ps)
July 30, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER dismissing plaintiff's 1 complaint with prejudice respect to his claims against defendants Elliot Levine, Jessica Skemp and Patricia O'Neil. Plaintiff's claims against defendants Ronald Tischer, Patricia O'Neil, Ryan Sec ord, Andrew Dittman, Shawn Kudron, Dan Ulrich, Nathan Poke and the City of La Crosse are dismissed without prejudice. Plaintiff may have until August 20, 2015, to file an amended complaint with respect to his claims against these defendants. Plaintiff's request to stay the case, dkt. # 4 , is DENIED. Signed by District Judge Barbara B. Crabb on 7/30/2015. (jef)(ps)
July 10, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER on ifp request: Plaintiff Phillip S. Dunn's 2 motion for leave to proceed without prepayment of fees is GRANTED. Complaint taken under advisement for screening. Signed by Magistrate Judge Peter A. Oppeneer on 7/10/2015. (nln),(ps)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Wisconsin Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Dunn, Phillip v. Levine, Elliott et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Phillip S. Dunn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ronald Tischer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ryan Secord
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Andrew Dittman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Shawn Kudron
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dan Ulrich
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nathan Poke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City of La Crosse, Wisconsin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?