United States of America v. Fleming, Robert et al
Plaintiff: United States of America
Defendant: Robert L. Fleming, Shelley R. Fleming, JPMorgan Chase Bank NA, Mortgage Electronic Registration Systems Inc., JPMC Specialty Mortgage LLC, Pierce County Wisconsin, Renewable Energy Team LLC, Wisconsin Department of Revenue and AG Partners Co-Op
Case Number: 3:2015cv00760
Filed: November 30, 2015
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Wisconsin
Office: Madison Office
County: Pierce
Presiding Judge: William M. Conley
Presiding Judge: Stephen L. Crocker
Nature of Suit: Taxes (US Plaintiff or Defendant)
Cause of Action: 26:7403
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
October 31, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 54 ORDER OF DISMISSAL. Signed by District Judge William M. Conley on 10/31/2019. (kwf)
June 7, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 52 ORDER staying case pursuant to bankruptcy of the Fleming defendants. Please note the June 8th default hearing is removed from the court's calendar. Signed by District Judge William M. Conley on 06/07/2016. (mfh)
March 25, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 37 ORDER granting 34 Motion to Set Aside Entry of Default. Signed by District Judge William M. Conley on 3/25/2016. (voc)
February 4, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER granting 16 Motion for Entry of Default against defendants Robert L. Fleming and Shelley R. Fleming. Signed by Peter A. Oppeneer, Clerk of Court on 2/4/2016. (voc)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Wisconsin Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: United States of America v. Fleming, Robert et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: United States of America
Represented By: Gretchen Ellen Nygaard(Designation Government)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robert L. Fleming
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Shelley R. Fleming
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JPMorgan Chase Bank NA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mortgage Electronic Registration Systems Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JPMC Specialty Mortgage LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pierce County Wisconsin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Renewable Energy Team LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wisconsin Department of Revenue
Represented By: Adam Y. Ben-Zikri
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AG Partners Co-Op
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?