Bernatello's Pizza, Inc. v. Hansen Foods, LLC
Plaintiff: Bernatello's Pizza, Inc.
Defendant: Hansen Foods, LLC
Case Number: 3:2016cv00065
Filed: January 27, 2016
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Wisconsin
Office: Madison Office
County: Brown
Presiding Judge: Stephen L. Crocker
Presiding Judge: James D. Peterson
Nature of Suit: Trademark
Cause of Action: 15:1051
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
July 23, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 70 ORDER provisionally GRANTING plaintiff's motion, Dkt. 66, prohibiting defendant from distributing brochures using the mark BREWHAUS. Signed by District Judge James D. Peterson on 07/23/2016. (jdp)
April 21, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 51 PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION. Signed by District Judge James D. Peterson on 4/20/16. (jat)
April 9, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 39 ORDER granting 31 Motion for Clarification and requiring further submissions on 26 Order on Motion for Preliminary Injunction. Signed by District Judge James D. Peterson on 04/09/2016. (jdp)
March 25, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ORDER granting 7 Motion for Preliminary Injunction. The parties will submit proposed injunction orders and proposals for adequate security by 4/8/2016. If the parties are unable to submit joint submissions, plaintiff may have until 4/8/2016 to submit its proposal and defendant may have until 4/15/2016 to submit any objections. The parties shall file electronic copies of their hearing exhibits by 4/1/2016. Signed by District Judge James D. Peterson on 3/25/2016. (arw)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Wisconsin Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bernatello's Pizza, Inc. v. Hansen Foods, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bernatello's Pizza, Inc.
Represented By: Craig Fieschko
Represented By: Elijah Byrnes Van Camp
Represented By: Harry E. Van Camp
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hansen Foods, LLC
Represented By: Sherry Dawn Coley
Represented By: Joseph S. Heino
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?