Fabick, Inc. v. FABCO Equipment, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Fabick, Inc.
Defendant: FABCO Equipment, Inc. and JFTCO, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2016cv00172
Filed: March 17, 2016
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Wisconsin
Office: Madison Office
County: Dane
Presiding Judge: William M. Conley
Presiding Judge: Stephen L. Crocker
Nature of Suit: Trademark
Cause of Action: 15:1125
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
March 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 393 ORDER granting in part and denying in part 376 Motion for Permanent Injunction ; Denying 377 Motion for Attorney Fees by Plaintiff Fabick, Inc. ; Denying as moot 388 Motion to Strike; Denying defendant's request for motion against plaintiff's trademark infringement claims 379 . Signed by District Judge William M. Conley on 3/22/2019. (voc/bgw)
December 19, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 368 OPINION AND ORDER. It is Ordered that defendant JFTCO, Inc.'s motion for judgment as a matter of law under Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 50(a) is denied. Signed by District Judge William M. Conley on 12/18/2017. (voc)
December 13, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 352 OPINION AND ORDER. Signed by District Judge William M. Conley on 12/13/2017. (voc)
December 12, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 349 ORDER granting 238 Motion in Limine by Defendants FABCO Equipment, Inc. Plaintiff Fabick, Inc.'s objection to defendant JFTCO, Inc.'s Exhibit No. 993 is SUSTAINED, although defendant may use the letter for impeachment. Defendant's ob jections to plaintiff's Exhibit Nos. 157-159 are OVERRULED. Plaintiff may present evidence of FABCO's historic sales in Wisconsin and the UP but only to illustrate the appropriate market segment, not to argue that JFTCO / John Fabick Tractor Company's sales were de minimis or not substantial by comparison. Signed by District Judge William M. Conley on 12/11/2017. (voc)
December 4, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 327 ORDER granting in part and denying in part 245 Motion in Limine; granting 228 Motion in Limine; granting 229 Motion in Limine; granting 230 Motion in Limine; granting 231 Motion in Limine; denying 232 Motion in Limine; granting in part an d denying in part 233 Motion in Limine; reserving 234 Motion in Limine; denying 235 Motion in Limine; granting 236 Motion in Limine; denying 237 Motion in Limine; reserving 238 Motion in Limine; granting 239 Motion in Limine; granting 240 Motion in Limine. Signed by District Judge William M. Conley on 12/4/2017. (arw)
November 8, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 221 ORDER denying 90 plaintiff's Motion for Summary Judgment. ; granting in part and denying in part 117 defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment. ; denying 195 plaintiff's Motion to Strike ; granting 200 defendants' Motion for Leave to File ; granting 211 reserved portion of defendants' Motion to Compel. Signed by District Judge William M. Conley on 11/08/2017. (mfh)
October 5, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 215 ORDER granting in part, denying in part and reserving in part 211 Defendants' Motion to Compel. Signed by District Judge William M. Conley on 10/05/2017. (mfh)
June 7, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 88 ORDER granting 42 , Defendant JFTCO, Inc.'s motion to dismiss plaintiff's ACPA count, denying 58 Plaintiff Fabick, Inc.'s motion to amend the pleadings. Plaintiff is directed to file a second amended complaint consistent with this court's order by June 14, 2017. Defendants' answers are due by June 28, 2017. Signed by District Judge William M. Conley on 6/7/2017. (voc)
September 30, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 48 ORDER: It is ordered that plaintiff Fabick, Inc.'s motion to disqualify counsel for JFTCO, Inc. (dkt. # 27 ) is DENIED, except the court will order Attorney Paul Fleischut to not be involved in this action and will require Senniger Powers, LLP to construct an ethical wall between Attorney Fleischut and any work by Senniger on this lawsuit. Signed by District Judge William M. Conley on 9/30/2016. (voc)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Wisconsin Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Fabick, Inc. v. FABCO Equipment, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Fabick, Inc.
Represented By: Cathleen A. Dettmann
Represented By: Kevin J. Palmersheim
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FABCO Equipment, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JFTCO, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?