Price, Mikiea v. Adam Auto Sales

Plaintiff: Mikiea L Price
Defendant: Adam Auto Sales
Case Number: 3:2016cv00197
Filed: March 29, 2016
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Wisconsin
Office: Madison Office
County: Dane
Presiding Judge: Stephen L. Crocker
Presiding Judge: James D. Peterson
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
December 15, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER granting defendant Adam Auto Sales' 17 motion to dismiss or transfer this case; denying as moot defendant's 21 motion to strike. This case is transferred to the United States District Court for the Northern District of Illinois. Signed by District Judge James D. Peterson on 12/15/2016. (jef),(ps)
June 8, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER granting 15 Motion to set aside the entry of default. Defendant is ordered to answer by June 22, 2016. Signed by District Judge James D. Peterson on 6/8/2016. (jef),(ps)
April 28, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER that plaintiff Mikiea Price has until May 12, 2016, to file and serve an amended complaint containing good faith allegations sufficient to establish diversity jurisdiction under 28 U.S.C. § 1332. Signed by District Judge James D. Peterson on 4/28/2016. (jef),(ps)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Wisconsin Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Price, Mikiea v. Adam Auto Sales
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mikiea L Price
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Adam Auto Sales
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?