In re The Melvin S. Cohen Trust for the Minneapolis Jewish Federation v. The Minneapolis Jewish Federation
Plaintiff: |
In re The Melvin S. Cohen Trust for the Minneapolis Jewish Federation |
Defendant: |
The Minneapolis Jewish Federation |
Third_party_defendant: |
Frederic J. Fransen, Emanuel J. Kallina, II and Maryjo Cohen |
Third_party_plaintiff: |
The Minneapolis Jewish Federation |
Counter_claimant: |
The Minneapolis Jewish Federation |
Counter_defendant: |
In re The Melvin S. Cohen Trust for the Minneapolis Jewish Federation |
Case Number: |
3:2016cv00325 |
Filed: |
May 16, 2016 |
Court: |
US District Court for the Western District of Wisconsin |
Office: |
Madison Office |
County: |
Dane |
Presiding Judge: |
Stephen L. Crocker |
Presiding Judge: |
James D. Peterson |
Nature of Suit: |
Other Contract |
Cause of Action: |
28 U.S.C. § 1332 |
Jury Demanded By: |
None |
Available Case Documents
The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed |
Document Text |
November 28, 2018 |
Filing
294
OPINION and ORDER granting the Trustees' motions to stay the judgment and approve the supersedeas bond pending appeal, Dkt. 288 and Dkt. 291 . Signed by District Judge James D. Peterson on 11/28/18. (jat)
|
September 28, 2018 |
Filing
271
ORDER denying 269 Motion to Strike, dismissing the Trustees' claim that the Federation breached its fiduciary duty, and making further declarations. The Federation is entitled to reasonable attorney fees and costs. The Federation has until 10/ 18/2018 to file a properly supported fee petition and bill of costs. The Trustees have until 11/1/2018 to file their opposition. The Trustees must reimburse the Trust for the legal fees paid to Kallina and his law firm. In the absence of an agreement on the amount of fees, the Federation should submit its proposal by 10/18/2018. The Trustees have until 11/1/2018 to file their opposition. The parties must confer on an institutional trustee to fill the Independent Trusteeship. The Trustees have un til 10/1/2018 to inform the court of the Melvin S. Cohen Foundation's selection of a successor to the Cohen Family Trusteeship. The court will forestall the removal of the Trustees and entering judgment until the outstanding issues involving remedies are resolved. Signed by District Judge James D. Peterson on 9/28/2018. (arw)
|
December 14, 2017 |
Filing
188
OPINION & ORDER granting in part and denying in part 119 the Trustees' Motion for Partial Summary Judgment; granting in part and denying in part 129 the Federation's Motion for Summary Judgment; granting 174 Motion to Strike; granting in part and denying in part 178 Motion to Compel. Signed by District Judge James D. Peterson on 12/14/17. (jat) (Main Document 188 replaced on 12/14/2017) (jat).
|
August 18, 2017 |
Filing
114
OPINION & ORDER granting in part and denying in part 49 Motion to Compel; granting in part and denying in part 72 Motion to Dismiss. Signed by District Judge James D. Peterson on 8/18/17. (jat)
|
January 11, 2017 |
Filing
44
OPINION & ORDER granting in part and denying in part 27 Motion for an Order Prohibiting Payment of Plaintiffs' Litigation Expenses from Trust Funds. Signed by District Judge James D. Peterson on 1/11/17. (jat)
|
Access additional case information on PACER
Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system.
A subscription to PACER is required.
Access this case on the Wisconsin Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System
Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.
Why Is My Information Online?