Ards, Tyrone v. Casiana et al
Plaintiff: Tyrone D. Ards
Defendant: Casiana, Mike Morrison, Theodore Anderson, Dan Norge, Raymond Woods, Randy Schneider, Thompson, Stellick, Lucas Weber, David Melby, Jane/John Doe Nurses 1-3 and Joe Reda
Case Number: 3:2016cv00341
Filed: May 24, 2016
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Wisconsin
Office: Madison Office
County: Columbia
Presiding Judge: Stephen L. Crocker
Presiding Judge: James D. Peterson
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
February 15, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 139 ORDER that attorneys James Law and Jeff Roeske of the law firm Reinhart Boerner Van Deuren S.C. have agreed to represent plaintiff Tyrone D. Ards. Plaintiff may have until February 26, 2018, to file a status report on how the case should proceed. Defendants' response to plaintiff's status report is due March 12, 2018. Signed by District Judge James D. Peterson on 2/15/2018. (jef),(ps)
December 29, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 138 ORDER denying 76 Motion for Reconsideration; denying 78 Motion to amend caption of complaint; denying 81 Motion for Summary Judgment; denying 99 Motion to Strike; denying 112 Motion to Compel; denying 113 Motion for Sanctions; granting 125 Motion for Leave to File Sur-Reply; denying 130 Motion for order directing institution to provide legal documents to prepare for trial; denying 131 Motion to compel production of legal documents; granting 136 Motion for Assistance in Recruiting Counsel. All proceedings are stayed pending recruitment of counsel for plaintiff. Signed by District Judge James D. Peterson on 12/29/2017. (elc),(ps)
April 27, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 66 ORDER denying plaintiff's 60 motion for reconsideration; denying as moot 53 motion for an order allowing plaintiff to correspond with witnesses using his legal loan; denying as moot 56 Motion to Compel. Plaintiff's claims agai nst defendant Ann Peters-Anderson are DISMISSED. Defendant Ann Peters-Anderson is DISMISSED from this case. The Wisconsin Attorney General's Office is directed to alert the Department of Corrections officials about plaintiff's refusal t o eat his meals or drink water, Dkt. 65 . The clerk of court is directed to send plaintiff a copy of this court's administrative order on motions for injunctive relief. Signed by District Judge James D. Peterson on 4/27/2017. (jef),(ps)
February 28, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 47 ORDER that defendants may file by March 6, 2017, a response to this order seeking leave to file an untimely motion. Signed by District Judge James D. Peterson on 2/28/2017. (jef),(ps)
January 4, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 37 ORDER denying 27 Motion for Sanctions. Signed by District Judge James D. Peterson on 1/4/2017. (jef),(ps)
June 27, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER dismissing 1 complaint pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 18 and 20. Plaintiff's 4 Motion for Assistance in Recruiting Counsel is denied. Amended complaint due 7/18/2016. Signed by District Judge James D. Peterson on 6/27/2016. (jef),(ps)
June 1, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER on ifp request: Plaintiff Tyrone Ards assessed an initial partial filing fee of $ 21.73 due 6/22/2016. Signed by Magistrate Judge Peter Oppeneer on 6/01/2016. (nln),(ps)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Wisconsin Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ards, Tyrone v. Casiana et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tyrone D. Ards
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Casiana
Represented By: Corey Francis Finkelmeyer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mike Morrison
Represented By: Corey Francis Finkelmeyer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Theodore Anderson
Represented By: Corey Francis Finkelmeyer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dan Norge
Represented By: Corey Francis Finkelmeyer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Raymond Woods
Represented By: Corey Francis Finkelmeyer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Randy Schneider
Represented By: Corey Francis Finkelmeyer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Thompson
Represented By: Corey Francis Finkelmeyer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Stellick
Represented By: Corey Francis Finkelmeyer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lucas Weber
Represented By: Corey Francis Finkelmeyer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David Melby
Represented By: Corey Francis Finkelmeyer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jane/John Doe Nurses 1-3
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Joe Reda
Represented By: Corey Francis Finkelmeyer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?