Mitchell, Roy v. Wasserberg, Sara et al
Plaintiff: Roy Mitchell
Defendant: Sara Wasserberg, Tina Gensler and All other responsible parties unknown unto plaintiff at this time
Case Number: 3:2016cv00593
Filed: August 29, 2016
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Wisconsin
Office: Madison Office
County: Dane
Presiding Judge: William M. Conley
Presiding Judge: Stephen L. Crocker
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
November 27, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 101 SCHEDULING ORDER. Signed by District Judge William M. Conley on 11/27/2018. (jef),(ps)
May 30, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 80 ORDER granting plaintiff Roy Mitchell's 69 motion to compel as set forth in this order; denying plaintiff's 66 motion for sanctions; and granting plaintiff's 52 motion for PACER access. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker on 5/30/2018. (nln),(ps)
September 13, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER on ifp request: Initial partial filing fee of $ 3.48 assessed and received on 9/2/2016. No further action will be taken in this case until the court has screened the complaint as required by the Prisoner Litigation Reform Act, 28 U.S.C.§ 1915(e)(2). Signed by Magistrate Judge Peter A. Oppeneer on 9/13/2016. (jef),(ps)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Wisconsin Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Mitchell, Roy v. Wasserberg, Sara et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Roy Mitchell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sara Wasserberg
Represented By: Corey Francis Finkelmeyer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tina Gensler
Represented By: Corey Francis Finkelmeyer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: All other responsible parties unknown unto plaintiff at this time
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?