Authenticom, Inc. v. CDK Global, LLC et al

Plaintiff: Authenticom, Inc.
Defendant: CDK Global, LLC and The Reynolds and Reynolds Company
Case Number: 3:2017cv00318
Filed: May 1, 2017
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Wisconsin
Office: Madison Office
County: La Crosse
Referring Judge: Stephen L. Crocker
Presiding Judge: James D. Peterson
Nature of Suit: Antitrust
Cause of Action: 15:1
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
February 1, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 246 Conditional Transfer Order (Copy). Signed by Sarah S. Vance, Chair of the Panel on Multidistrict Litigation on 2/1/2018. (kwf)
January 12, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 245 ORDER granting 231 Motion for Partial Stay of Discovery. Depositions, discovery related to electronically-stored information, and all court deadlines are STAYED until the Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation resolves the pending motion to consolidate this case with several other similar cases. Signed by District Judge James D. Peterson on 1/12/2018. (kwf)
August 4, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 209 ORDER granting in part and denying in part 190 Motion for Summary Denial of Defendants' Motions to Dismiss and to Dismiss or Strike Reynolds' Counterclaims as Improper, or, in the Alternative, for an Extension of Time. Plaintiff' s response(s) to the motions to dismiss, Dkt. 175 and Dkt. 187 , will be due September 8, 2017. Defendants' replies will be due October 6, 2017. Defendant the Reynolds and Reynolds Company's counterclaims, Dkt. 180 , are withdrawn. The clerk's office should disregard the entry. Reynolds will refile its counterclaims with its answer. Signed by District Judge James D. Peterson on 8/4/2017. (kwf)
August 1, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 208 ORDER denying 204 Motion to Stay; denying 206 Motion to Stay. The court will grant a temporary stay of the preliminary injunctions for seven days to allow Reynolds and CDK the opportunity to seek emergency relief from the Seventh Circuit. Signed by District Judge James D. Peterson on 8/1/2017. (kwf)
July 28, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 193 PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION Against CDK Global, LLC. Signed by District Judge James D. Peterson on 7/28/2017. (kwf)
July 14, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 172 OPINION & ORDER granting 51 Motion for Preliminary Injunction; granting 168 Motion to Admit Preliminary Injunction Hearing Exhibits; granting in part and denying in part 170 Motion to Admit Preliminary Injunction Hearing Exhibits. The parti es will work together to craft the form of the injunction. The parties are ordered to confer and to submit an agreed proposed form of injunction to the court by July 21, 2017. If the parties cannot agree on all terms of the injunction, they should set out their competing proposals in the document. Signed by District Judge James D. Peterson on 7/14/2017. (kwf)
May 22, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 81 ORDER regarding schedule for plaintiff's motion for preliminary injunction: defendants' opposition is due June 16; plaintiff may file a reply by June 22; evidentiary hearing will be June 26-27. Signed by District Judge James D. Peterson on 05/22/2017. (ejt)
May 4, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 30 ORDER of Recusal. District Judge William M. Conley recused. Case randomly reassigned to District Judge James D. Peterson for all further proceedings. Signed by District Judge William M. Conley on 5/4/2017. (kwf)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Wisconsin Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Authenticom, Inc. v. CDK Global, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Authenticom, Inc.
Represented By: Jennifer Lynn Gregor
Represented By: Joshua Hafenbrack
Represented By: Mark Warren Hancock
Represented By: Derek T. Ho
Represented By: Kevin Johnson Miller
Represented By: Michael N. Nemelka
Represented By: Aaron M. Panner
Represented By: David L. Schwarz
Represented By: Joanna Tianyang Zhang
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CDK Global, LLC
Represented By: Joseph S Harper
Represented By: Britt Marie Miller
Represented By: Matthew David Provance
Represented By: Mark William Ryan
Represented By: Jeffrey Allan Simmons
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Reynolds and Reynolds Company
Represented By: Jesse Jonas Bair
Represented By: Michael P. A. Cohen
Represented By: Charles Grant Curtis, Jr.
Represented By: Aundrea K. Gulley
Represented By: Ross M. MacDonald
Represented By: Brian T. Ross
Represented By: John S. Skilton
Represented By: Michelle Marie Umberger
Represented By: Brice A. Wilkinson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?