Prude, Terrance v. Meli, Anthony et al
Plaintiff: |
Terrance Prude |
Defendant: |
Anthony Meli, Randy Mueller and Westra |
Case Number: |
3:2017cv00336 |
Filed: |
May 5, 2017 |
Court: |
US District Court for the Western District of Wisconsin |
Office: |
Madison Office |
County: |
Grant |
Presiding Judge: |
William M. Conley |
Presiding Judge: |
Stephen L. Crocker |
Nature of Suit: |
Prison Condition |
Cause of Action: |
42 U.S.C. § 1983 |
Jury Demanded By: |
Plaintiff |
Available Case Documents
The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed |
Document Text |
April 12, 2024 |
Filing
222
ORDER denying 213 Motion to Deny Motion for Sanctions and Deny Evidentiary Hearing from Being Held re 204 Motion for Sanctions . Signed by Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker on 4/12/2024. (voc),(ps)
|
April 27, 2020 |
Filing
132
JUDGMENT entered in favor of Defendants dismissing the case. (rks),(ps)
|
December 18, 2019 |
Filing
128
ORDER that Plaintiff Terrance Prude's motion to reinstate Captain Westra as a defendant (dkt. 104 ) is DENIED. Plaintiff's motion to add DOC Secretary Carr as a defendant (dkt. 105 ) is DENIED without prejudice. Plaintiff's motion to compel and for sanctions (dkt. 111 ) is DENIED without prejudice. Plaintiff's motion to file sur-reply brief (dkt. 126 ) is GRANTED. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker on 12/18/2019. (rks),(ps)
|
August 9, 2019 |
Filing
103
ORDER that Plaintiff Terrance Prude's third motion for reconsideration (dkt. 97 ) is GRANTED. Prude's motion to supplement his complaint (dkt. 99) is GRANTED. Prude may proceed against defendant Meli on the theory that Meli was a biased decision-maker, as provided above. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker on 8/6/2019. (rks),(ps)
|
July 10, 2019 |
Filing
92
ORDER denying Plaintiff Terrance Prude's 55 Motion for Reconsideration. Defendants' motion for extension (dkt. 86 at 7) and Prude's motion to file a sur-reply (dkt. # 91 ) are GRANTED. Prude has until July 22, 2019, to reply to defendants' supplemental brief, response to proposed findings of fact and proposed findings of fact (dkt. 87 , 88 , 89 ). Signed by Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker on 7/10/2019. (jef),(ps)
|
April 26, 2019 |
Filing
73
ORDER regarding pending motions and that Prude's dispositive motions and accompanying submissions are acceptable in Case No. 336. The court will take up all of the dispositive motions at once when both sides have timely submitted their documents. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker on 4/26/2019. (jef),(ps)
|
February 4, 2019 |
Filing
54
ORDER granting in part and denying in part plaintiff's 42 Motion for Reconsideration; insofar as Prude may proceed on his due process claim against Meli related to his allegation that Westra did not consider the letters from Nistler and Jones in resolving the conduct report. Plaintiff's motion for adequate writing material (dkt. 48 ) is DENIED. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker on 2/4/2019. (jef),(ps)
|
May 5, 2017 |
Filing
3
ORDER directing plaintiff to submit fee or motion for ifp and Trust Fund Account Statement by 5/26/2017. Signed by Magistrate Judge Peter A. Oppeneer on 5/5/2017. (jef),(ps)
|
Access additional case information on PACER
Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system.
A subscription to PACER is required.
Access this case on the Wisconsin Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System
Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.
Why Is My Information Online?