Inguran, LLC et al v. ABS Global, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Inguran, LLC, Cytonome/ST, LLC and XY, LLC
Defendant: ABS Global, Inc., Genus PLC and Premium Genetics (UK) Ltd
Case Number: 3:2017cv00446
Filed: June 7, 2017
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Wisconsin
Office: Madison Office
County: Dane
Presiding Judge: William M. Conley
Presiding Judge: Stephen L. Crocker
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 35:271
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
August 12, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 655 ORDER granting ( 643 in 3:17-cv-446-wmc) Motion to Stay the Judgments With Respect to Ongoing Royalties. Signed by District Judge William M. Conley on 8/11/2020. (arw)
June 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 613 AMENDED JUDGMENT. (voc)
June 8, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 607 FINAL JUDGMENT. (voc)
April 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 280 ORDER granting in part and denying in part 156 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment; denying 163 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment. This case and ABS v. Inguran, LLC, No. 14-cv-503, are consolidated for purposes of trial, commencing September 3, 2019. The court will hold a telephone scheduling conference on May 13, 2019 at 10:00 AM, counsel for plaintiff to establish the call to chambers at (608) 264-5087. Signed by District Judge William M. Conley on 4/29/2019. (arw)
February 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 270 OPINION AND ORDER granting in part and reserving in part 156 Defendants' Motion for Partial Summary Judgment; granting 221 Unopposed Motion to Supplement the Rebuttal Expert Report of Dr. John Nolan; granting 230 Unopposed Motion to Supplement the Expert Report of Dr. Charles Ostermeier. Signed by District Judge William M. Conley on 2/26/19. (jat)
September 28, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 172 ORDER denying without prejudice 33 Motion to Dismiss by Defendants ABS Global, Inc., Genus PLC, Premium Genetics (UK) Ltd. Signed by District Judge William M. Conley on 9/28/2018. (arw)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Wisconsin Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Inguran, LLC et al v. ABS Global, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Inguran, LLC
Represented By: Clayton Nicholas Matheson
Represented By: Daniel L Moffett
Represented By: Kirt Stephen O'Neill
Represented By: George Andrew Rosbrook
Represented By: Rehan Safiullah
Represented By: Sarah Anne Zylstra
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cytonome/ST, LLC
Represented By: Clayton Nicholas Matheson
Represented By: Daniel L Moffett
Represented By: Kirt Stephen O'Neill
Represented By: George Andrew Rosbrook
Represented By: Rehan Safiullah
Represented By: Sarah Anne Zylstra
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: XY, LLC
Represented By: Clayton Nicholas Matheson
Represented By: Daniel L Moffett
Represented By: Kirt Stephen O'Neill
Represented By: George Andrew Rosbrook
Represented By: Rehan Safiullah
Represented By: Sarah Anne Zylstra
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ABS Global, Inc.
Represented By: Michael J. Modl
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Genus PLC
Represented By: Michael J. Modl
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Premium Genetics (UK) Ltd
Represented By: Michael J. Modl
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?