Reed, Laera v. Ourada, John et al

Plaintiff: Laera Denise Reed
Defendant: John Ourada, Paul Westerhaus, Wayne S. Olson, Wendy Peterson, Brian Gustke, Lori McCallister, Kyle Hoff and Charles Palmer
Case Number: 3:2017cv00590
Filed: July 31, 2017
Court: Wisconsin Western District Court
Office: Madison Office
County: Dane
Presiding Judge: Barbara B. Crabb
Referring Judge: Stephen L. Crocker
Nature of Suit: Other Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
March 21, 2018 36 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 33 Joint Motion to Stay. Signed by District Judge Barbara B. Crabb on 3/21/2018. (kwf)
February 14, 2018 28 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 24 Motion for Entry of Judgment under Rule 54(b). The clerk of court shall enter judgment in favor of defendant Charles Palmer on all of plaintiffs' claims against him. Signed by District Judge Barbara B. Crabb on 2/14/2018. (kwf) (Main Document 28 replaced on 2/14/2018) (voc).
December 28, 2017 23 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 8 Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction. Defendant Palmer is dismissed as a defendant in this case. Signed by District Judge Barbara B. Crabb on 12/28/2017. (voc)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Wisconsin Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Reed, Laera v. Ourada, John et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Laera Denise Reed
Represented By: Jack Bjorn Bjornstad
Represented By: John Mandel Sandy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Ourada
Represented By: Amy J. Doyle
Represented By: Samuel C. Hall, Jr.
Represented By: Kiley B. Zellner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Paul Westerhaus
Represented By: Amy J. Doyle
Represented By: Samuel C. Hall, Jr.
Represented By: Kiley B. Zellner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wayne S. Olson
Represented By: Amy J. Doyle
Represented By: Samuel C. Hall, Jr.
Represented By: Kiley B. Zellner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wendy Peterson
Represented By: Amy J. Doyle
Represented By: Samuel C. Hall, Jr.
Represented By: Kiley B. Zellner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brian Gustke
Represented By: Amy J. Doyle
Represented By: Samuel C. Hall, Jr.
Represented By: Kiley B. Zellner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lori McCallister
Represented By: Amy J. Doyle
Represented By: Samuel C. Hall, Jr.
Represented By: Kiley B. Zellner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kyle Hoff
Represented By: Amy J. Doyle
Represented By: Samuel C. Hall, Jr.
Represented By: Kiley B. Zellner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Charles Palmer
Represented By: Gretchen Elizabeth Kraemer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?