Miller, Susan v. CenturyLink, Inc. et al

Plaintiff: Susan Miller
Defendant: CenturyLink, Inc., CenturyLink Communications, LLC, CenturyLink Public Communications, Inc., CenturyLink Sales Solutions, Inc., Qwest Corporation and CenturyTel of Wisconsin, LLC
Case Number: 3:2017cv00648
Filed: August 21, 2017
Court: Wisconsin Western District Court
Office: Madison Office
County: La Crosse
Presiding Judge: William M. Conley
Referring Judge: Stephen L. Crocker
Nature of Suit: Other Fraud
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
October 31, 2017 Opinion or Order 25 Certified Copy of Conditional Transfer Order. Case closed. Signed by Clerk of the Panel Jeffery N. Luthi on 10/16/2017. (kwf)
October 16, 2017 Opinion or Order 24 Conditional Transfer Order (Copy). Signed by Clerk of the Panel Jeffery N. Luthi on 10/16/2017. (kwf)
October 3, 2017 Opinion or Order 21 ORDER granting in part 17 Motion to Stay Pending Ruling of the Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation. The court will amend the deadline for defendants' answer to the amended complaint to one week after the Panel issues its decision on the motion (but no earlier than October 16, 2017). Signed by District Judge William M. Conley on 10/3/2017. (kwf)
August 23, 2017 Opinion or Order 3 OPINION AND ORDER Regarding Jurisdiction. Plaintiff Susan Miller has until September 6, 2017, to file an amended complaint containing good faith allegations sufficient to establish subject matter jurisdiction under 28 U.S.C. § 1332(d). If an y of the defendants are citizens of Wisconsin, by September 8, 2017, plaintiff shall filed a brief explaining why certain discretionary and mandatory exceptions, 28 U.S.C. § 1332(d)(3), (4), do not apply. Signed by District Judge William M. Conley on 8/23/2017. (kwf)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Wisconsin Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Miller, Susan v. CenturyLink, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Susan Miller
Represented By: Richard Michael Hagstrom
Represented By: Anne Troy Regan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CenturyLink, Inc.
Represented By: Michael D. Leffel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CenturyLink Communications, LLC
Represented By: Michael D. Leffel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CenturyLink Public Communications, Inc.
Represented By: Michael D. Leffel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CenturyLink Sales Solutions, Inc.
Represented By: Michael D. Leffel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Qwest Corporation
Represented By: Michael D. Leffel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CenturyTel of Wisconsin, LLC
Represented By: Michael D. Leffel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?