One Wisconsin Now v. Kremer, Jesse et al
Plaintiff: One Wisconsin Now
Defendant: Jesse Kremer, John Nygren and Robin Vos
Case Number: 3:2017cv00820
Filed: October 31, 2017
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Wisconsin
Office: Madison Office
County: Dane
Presiding Judge: William M. Conley
Presiding Judge: Stephen L. Crocker
Nature of Suit: Other Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
May 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 91 DECLARATORY JUDGMENT entered in favor of plaintiff One Wisconsin Now and against defendants Jesse Kremer, John Nygren, and Robin Vos, finding that defendants blocked plaintiff from their respective government Twitter accounts in violation of plaintiff's First Amendment rights. (WMC/PAO) (kwf)
May 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 90 ORDER granting 71 Motion to Dismiss as to substituted defendant Timothy Ramthun only; and granting plaintiff's request for declaratory judgment that defendants Jesse Kremer, John Nygren and Robin Vos violated plaintiff One Wisconsin Now's First Amendment rights in blocking plaintiff from their respective government Twitter accounts. Signed by District Judge William M. Conley on 05/17/2019. (mfh)
January 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 80 OPINION AND ORDER granting 27 Motion for Summary Judgment; denying 56 Motion for Summary Judgment; granting in part and denying in part 38 Motion to Strike Expert Report; granting 69 Motion for Leave to File Sur-Reply Brief; denying as moot 74 Motion to Strike Jury Demand; granting 77 Motion to Supplement Motion for Summary Judgment. All remaining deadlines in this case are STRUCK, except for the briefing schedule on relief set forth above and defendant Kremer's motion to dismiss previously set by the court. The parties are also to hold open March 11, 2019, for possible argument and presentation of evidence as to the appropriate remedy, if necessary. Signed by District Judge William M. Conley on 1/18/2019. (kwf)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Wisconsin Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: One Wisconsin Now v. Kremer, Jesse et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: One Wisconsin Now
Represented By: Aaron Dumas
Represented By: Lester A. Pines
Represented By: Christa Oliver Westerberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jesse Kremer
Represented By: Steven Carl Kilpatrick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Nygren
Represented By: Steven Carl Kilpatrick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robin Vos
Represented By: Steven Carl Kilpatrick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?