Smith-Williams, Consuela et al v. The United States of America
Plaintiff: Consuela Smith-Williams, Fred Rivers, Richard Murphy, Robert Ristow, Roger Suhr and Salvador Fuentes
Defendant: The United States of America
Case Number: 3:2017cv00823
Filed: November 1, 2017
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Wisconsin
Office: Madison Office
County: Monroe
Presiding Judge: William M. Conley
Presiding Judge: Stephen L. Crocker
Nature of Suit: Personal Injury- Medical Malpractice
Cause of Action: 28:1346
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
December 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 174 ORDER granting in part and denying in part and reserving in part defendant's 152 Motion in Limine; granting, subject to modification at the final pretrial conference, respondent's 157 Motion to Quash. Signed by District Judge William M. Conley on 12/10/2019. (jls)
October 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 142 ORDER denying 89 Motion for Summary Judgment. Signed by District Judge William M. Conley on 10/8/2019. (jls)
April 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 88 ORDER denying 30 Motion to Certify Class under Rule 23. Signed by District Judge William M. Conley on 4/25/2019. (jls)
September 25, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 28 ORDER denying 8 Motion to Dismiss; denying 26 Motion to Stay Class Certification Briefing. Each of the three deadlines related to plaintiffs' class certification motion is extended one week. Motion to Certify Class under Rule 23 due 10/26/2018. Response due 11/23/2018. Reply due 12/14/2018. Signed by District Judge William M. Conley on 9/25/2018. (arw)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Wisconsin Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Smith-Williams, Consuela et al v. The United States of America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Consuela Smith-Williams
Represented By: Matthew A. Biegert
Represented By: Christ Kishish, II
Represented By: William Thomas Rieder, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Fred Rivers
Represented By: Matthew A. Biegert
Represented By: Christ Kishish, II
Represented By: William Thomas Rieder, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Richard Murphy
Represented By: Matthew A. Biegert
Represented By: Christ Kishish, II
Represented By: William Thomas Rieder, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert Ristow
Represented By: Matthew A. Biegert
Represented By: Christ Kishish, II
Represented By: William Thomas Rieder, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Roger Suhr
Represented By: Matthew A. Biegert
Represented By: Christ Kishish, II
Represented By: William Thomas Rieder, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Salvador Fuentes
Represented By: Matthew A. Biegert
Represented By: Christ Kishish, II
Represented By: William Thomas Rieder, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The United States of America
Represented By: Leslie K. Herje(Designation Government)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?