Johnson Health Tech North America, Inc. v. Grow Fitness Group, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: |
Johnson Health Tech North America, Inc. |
Defendant: |
Grow Fitness Group, Inc. and Matthew Seaberg |
Case Number: |
3:2017cv00834 |
Filed: |
November 2, 2017 |
Court: |
US District Court for the Western District of Wisconsin |
Office: |
Madison Office |
County: |
Dane |
Presiding Judge: |
William M. Conley |
Presiding Judge: |
Stephen L. Crocker |
Nature of Suit: |
Other Contract |
Cause of Action: |
28 U.S.C. § 1332 |
Jury Demanded By: |
Plaintiff |
Available Case Documents
The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed |
Document Text |
February 21, 2020 |
Filing
91
ORDER that the reserved portion of plaintiff Johnson Health Tech North America, Inc.'s motion for partial summary judgment (dkt. 42 ) is DENIED. Plaintiff's motion for entry of default judgment against defendant Grow Fitness Group, Inc . a/k/a Grow Fitness, Inc. (dkt. 82 ) is GRANTED. Plaintiff's request to dismiss its remaining claims of conversion, civil theft and unjust enrichment against Seaberg (dkt. 85 ) is GRANTED. The clerk's office is directed to enter judgment. Signed by District Judge William M. Conley on 2/21/2020. (rks),(ps)
|
January 7, 2020 |
Filing
72
ORDER Plaintiff Johnson Health Tech North America, Inc.'s motion for partial summary judgment (dkt. 42 ) is GRANTED as to liability and RESERVED as to damages. Defendant Matthew Seaberg's motion for leave to file a sur-reply (dkt. 64 ) is GRANTED. Defendant's motion to transfer to middle district of Florida (dkt. 68 ) is DENIED. On or before January 17, 2020, plaintiff should submit an accounting reflecting the current amount due under the Note as of January 1 5, 2020; defendant's objections are due on or before January 24, 2020. The court will hold a telephonic conference with the parties on January 31, 2020, at 10:00 a.m. CST. Plaintiff to coordinate call to Chambers at 608-264-5087. Signed by District Judge William M. Conley on 01/07/2020. (rks),(ps)
|
June 13, 2019 |
Filing
33
ORDER granting 25 Motion to file an amended answer; denying as moot 11 Motion for Judgment on the Pleading. Amended answer due 6/21/2019. Outstanding discovery responses due 6/30/2019. Signed by District Judge William M. Conley on 6/13/2019. (jef),(ps)
|
Access additional case information on PACER
Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system.
A subscription to PACER is required.
Access this case on the Wisconsin Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System
Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.
Why Is My Information Online?