Kneipp, John v. Re-Vi Design, LLC
Plaintiff: John Kneipp
Defendant: Re-Vi Design, LLC
Case Number: 3:2017cv00857
Filed: November 13, 2017
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Wisconsin
Office: Madison Office
County: Marathon
Presiding Judge: Stephen L. Crocker
Nature of Suit: Fair Labor Standards Act
Cause of Action: 29:201
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
March 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 64 ORDER denying 32 Motion to Certify Class under Rule 23; granting 37 Motion to Decertify the FLSA collective action. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker on 3/15/2019. (jls)
October 11, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 48 ORDER: IT IS ORDERED that plaintiff John Kneipp's motion to compel, dkt. 28 , and defendant Re-vi Design, LLC's motion for clarification, dkt. 30 , are GRANTED only to the extent that, not later than November 2, 2018, defendant must produce a list of individuals whom it has employed on or after November 10, 2014. The motions are DENIED in all other respects. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker on 10/11/2018. (voc)
August 21, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ORDER granting 18 Motion for Conditional Certification of Class by Plaintiff John Kneipp. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker on 8/21/2018. (arw)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Wisconsin Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Kneipp, John v. Re-Vi Design, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John Kneipp
Represented By: Yingtao Ho
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Re-Vi Design, LLC
Represented By: Keith F. Ellison
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?