Murry, James v. Dodge Correctional Institution et al

Plaintiff: James Jefferson Murry
Defendant: Dodge Correctional Institution and Burling
Case Number: 3:2017cv00938
Filed: December 15, 2017
Court: Wisconsin Western District Court
Office: Madison Office
County: Oneida
Presiding Judge: Barbara B. Crabb
Referring Judge: Stephen L. Crocker
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
April 12, 2018 13 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT entered dismissing this case. Signed by Peter A. Oppeneer, Clerk of Court on 4/12/2018. (jef),(ps)
February 21, 2018 10 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER on ifp request: Plaintiff James Jefferson Murry assessed an initial partial filing fee of $22.75 due 3/15/2018. Signed by Magistrate Judge Peter A. Oppeneer on 2/21/2018. (Copy of order mailed to Dodge Correctional Institution Business Office.) (nln),(ps)
December 18, 2017 4 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER on ifp request: Plaintiff James Jefferson Murry to submit six-month Trust Fund Account Statement by 1/9/2018. Signed by Magistrate Judge Peter A. Oppeneer on 12/18/2017. (nln),(ps)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Wisconsin Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Murry, James v. Dodge Correctional Institution et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James Jefferson Murry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dodge Correctional Institution
Represented By: Corey Francis Finkelmeyer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Burling
Represented By: Corey Francis Finkelmeyer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?