Copus, Patricia et al v. Hepler, Todd et al

Plaintiff: Patricia Copus, Austan Bardell and Erik Hedberg
Defendant: Todd Hepler and Jane E. Kohlewey
Case Number: 3:2018cv00019
Filed: January 8, 2018
Court: Wisconsin Western District Court
Office: Madison Office
County: Columbia
Referring Judge: Stephen L. Crocker
Presiding Judge: James D. Peterson
Nature of Suit: Prison Condition
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
April 12, 2018 11 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER dismissing case under Younger v. Harris, 401 U.S. 37, 45 (1971), and Heck v. Humphrey, 512 U.S. 477 (1994). Signed by District Judge James D. Peterson on 4/12/2018. (elc),(ps)
March 20, 2018 9 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER on ifp request: Complaint taken under advisement for screening. Signed by Magistrate Judge Peter A. Oppeneer on 3/20/2018. (jef),(ps)
February 9, 2018 8 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER directing plaintiff Austan Bardell to submit a Trust Fund Account Statement by 3/5/2018. Signed by Magistrate Judge Peter A. Oppeneer on 2/9/2018. (jef),(ps)
January 9, 2018 3 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER that plaintiffs are to submit $400 filing fees or Trust Fund Account Statements by 2/1/2018. Signed by Magistrate Judge Peter A. Oppeneer on 1/9/2018. (jef),(ps)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Wisconsin Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Copus, Patricia et al v. Hepler, Todd et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Patricia Copus
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Austan Bardell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Erik Hedberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Todd Hepler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jane E. Kohlewey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?