Kriemelmeyer, Frederick v. Krebs, Kevin et al

Plaintiff: Frederick George Kriemelmeyer
Defendant: Kevin Krebs and Arnetta Mallory
Case Number: 3:2018cv00048
Filed: January 22, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Wisconsin
Office: Madison Office
County: La Crosse
Presiding Judge: Barbara B. Crabb
Presiding Judge: Stephen L. Crocker
Nature of Suit: Freedom of Information Act
Cause of Action: 05:552
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
April 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 56 JUDGMENT entered in favor of defendants dismissing these cases. Associated Cases: 3:18-cv-00148-bbc, 3:18-cv-00048-bbc (jef),(ps)
November 9, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 29 ORDER denying (20), (21) Motions to Compel in case 3:18-cv-00048-bbc; denying (21), (22) Motions to Compel. in case 3:18-cv-00148-bbc. Plaintiff's claims against defendant Kevin Krebbs are DISMISSED as moot. Krebs is DISMISSED as a defendant. Signed by District Judge Barbara B. Crabb on 11/9/2018. Associated Cases: 3:18-cv-00148-bbc, 3:18-cv-00048-bbc (jef),(ps)
September 13, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER in case 3:18-cv-00048-bbc; granting (11) Motion to Dismiss in case 3:18-cv-00148-bbc. Defendants Tillerson and Arde are DISMISSED asdefendants from this case. Signed by District Judge Barbara B. Crabb on 9/13/2018. Associated Cases: 3:18-cv-00148-bbc, 3:18-cv-00048-bbc (jef),(ps)
March 8, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER denying without prejudice plaintiff's 5 motion for reconsideration 4 order denying leave to proceed in forma pauperis. Plaintiff may have until 3/15/2018 to submit a detailed account of his monthly income and expenses as explained in this order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Peter A. Oppeneer on 3/8/2018. (nln),(ps)
January 23, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER directing plaintiff to submit $400 filing fee or an affidavit of indigency by 2/13/2018. Signed by Magistrate Judge Peter A. Oppeneer on 1/23/2018. (jef),(ps)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Wisconsin Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Kriemelmeyer, Frederick v. Krebs, Kevin et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Frederick George Kriemelmeyer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kevin Krebs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Arnetta Mallory
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?