Owen, Brenda v. Berryhill, Nancy

Plaintiff: Brenda Marcell Owen
Defendant: Nancy Berryhill
Case Number: 3:2018cv00100
Filed: February 14, 2018
Court: Wisconsin Western District Court
Office: Madison Office
County: Dane
Presiding Judge: William M. Conley
Referring Judge: Stephen L. Crocker
Nature of Suit: Supplemental Security Income
Cause of Action: 42:427
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
April 19, 2018 31 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT entered in favor of defendant dismissing this case without prejudice. Signed by Peter A. Oppeneer, Clerk of Court on 4/19/2018. (jef),(ps)
April 18, 2018 30 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER that cases 18-cv-100-wmc, 18-cv-101-wmc and 18-cv-106-wmc filed by Brenda Marcell Owen are DISMISSED without prejudice. The clerk of court is directed to enter judgment in each of these three actions in favor of defendant and close these cases. Signed by District Judge William M. Conley on 4/18/2018. (jef),(ps)
February 21, 2018 7 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER that plaintiff Brenda Marcell Owen's request to proceed in forma pauperis in each case is GRANTED. Service of the complaints is STAYED until Owen shows that she has obtained a final decision (or decisions) from the commissioner and she identifies the administrative decision(s) that she is challenging. If Owen fails to submit this information by March 30, 2018, then the court will dismiss her lawsuits. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker on 2/21/2018. (jef),(ps)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Wisconsin Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Owen, Brenda v. Berryhill, Nancy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brenda Marcell Owen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nancy Berryhill
Represented By: Commissioner of Social Security
Represented By: Richard Davis Humphrey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?