Zavala, Jimmy v. Waterman, Jolinda et al
Plaintiff: Jimmy Zavala
Defendant: Jolinda Waterman, Daniel Winkleski, Mark Kartman, Carrie Sutter, Brian Kool, Sonya L Anderson, Sandra McArdle and Lori Alsum
Case Number: 3:2018cv00331
Filed: May 7, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Wisconsin
Office: Madison Office
County: Out of State
Presiding Judge: Stephen L. Crocker
Presiding Judge: James D. Peterson
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
May 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 145 ORDER denying plaintiff Jimmy Zavala's 138 Motion to appeal to state court or circuit court in Dane County Courthouse; granting plaintiff's 141 Motion for Leave to Appeal in forma pauperis. Plaintiff may have until June 7, 2019, in which to submit a check or money order made payable to the clerk of court in the amount of $10.21. Signed by District Judge James D. Peterson on 5/20/2019. (jef),(ps)
April 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 136 JUDGMENT entered in favor of defendants dismissing this case. (jef),(ps)
December 14, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 106 ORDER that Plaintiff Jimmy Zavala's motions to supplement or amend his complaint to add new claims, Dkt. 69 and Dkt. 98 , are DENIED. Defendant Sandra McArdle may have until January 9, 2019, to respond to plaintiff's motion to add t he Wisconsin Injured Patients and Families Compensation Fund as a defendant, Dkt. 94 . Defendant McArdle's motion for summary judgment on exhaustion grounds, Dkt. 58 , is DENIED.Defendant McArdle's motion to stay the dispositive mot ions deadline pending resolution of her exhaustion motion, Dkt. 66 , is DENIED as moot. Plaintiff's motion for an extension of time to file his summary judgment opposition materials, Dkt. 101, is GRANTED. Plaintiff may have until January 9, 2019, to submit his opposition materials. Defendants may have until January 21, 2019, to file their respective replies. Plaintiff's motion for the court's assistance in recruiting him counsel, Dkt. 96 , is DENIED without prejudice. < p>The clerk of court is directed to send plaintiff a copy of the court's pretrial conference order, Dkt. 37 .Plaintiff's motion for entry of judgment as a sanction, Dkt. 104 , is DENIED without prejudice. Signed by District Judge James D. Peterson on 12/14/2018. (jef),(ps)
October 9, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 61 ORDER denying 45 Motion for Use of Release Account Funds; denying 53 Motion for Assistance in Recruiting Counsel. Signed by District Judge James D. Peterson on 10/9/2018. (jef),(ps)
August 3, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 40 ORDER granting Sandra McArdle's 29 Motion to set aside default. The clerk's entry of default against defendant McArdle is set aside. Signed by District Judge James D. Peterson on 8/3/2018. (elc),(ps)
June 21, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 33 ORDER denying plaintiff Jimmy Zavala's 22 motion to direct defendant Sandra McArdle to file an answer. A ruling on plaintiff's motion to enter default judgment against McArdle, Dkt. 21 , is STAYED pending resolution of Zavala's other claims. Signed by District Judge James D. Peterson on 6/21/2018. (jef),(ps)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Wisconsin Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Zavala, Jimmy v. Waterman, Jolinda et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jimmy Zavala
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jolinda Waterman
Represented By: Brandon T Flugaur
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Daniel Winkleski
Represented By: Brandon T Flugaur
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mark Kartman
Represented By: Brandon T Flugaur
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Carrie Sutter
Represented By: Brandon T Flugaur
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brian Kool
Represented By: Brandon T Flugaur
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sonya L Anderson
Represented By: Brandon T Flugaur
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sandra McArdle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lori Alsum
Represented By: Brandon T Flugaur
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?