Thom, David et al v. Garrigan, Daniel et al
Plaintiff: David Thom, Crystel Thom, William Cadwallader, Robert L. Wentworth, Raymond Boyle and Michael O'Grady
Defendant: Daniel Garrigan, Charles Poches, Matthew Foster, Peter Hibner, Robin Kvalo, Brad Meixner, Susan Conner, Shawn Murphy, Kenneth Manthey, Jason Stenberg, Robert Bagnell, Keith Klafke, Benjamin Neumann, Kevin Todryk, Peter Warning, Peter Bartaczewicz, Anthony Brauner, Michael Schulz, Dawn Wilcox, Marie Moe, Scott Klicko, Brian Noll, Roger Brandner, Joseph Ruf, Jordan Haueter, Leda Wagner, Douglas Jarzynski, David Clark, Michael Haverley, Mark Smit, Alexander Agnew, Benjamin Oetzman, Terri Pulvermacher, Max Jenanaschet, Cory Miller, Gregory Bisch, Thomas M. Drury, Charles Miller, Kathryn E. Miller and Robert Becker
Case Number: 3:2018cv00368
Filed: May 17, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Wisconsin
Office: Madison Office
County: Columbia
Presiding Judge: Stephen L. Crocker
Presiding Judge: James D. Peterson
Nature of Suit: Other Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
February 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 319 ORDER that Plaintiff Michael O'Grady's motions for relief from judgment, Dkt. 291-293, Dkt. 300, Dkt. 314, Dkt. 315 in 18-cv-368-jdp; Dkt. 207-209, Dkt. 216, Dkt. 230, Dkt. 231 in 18-cv-582-jdp; Dkt. 99, Dkt. 105, Dkt. 106, Dkt. 113, Dkt. 1 26, Dkt. 128 in 19-cv-515-jdp; and Dkt. 256-258, Dkt. 283-285 in 19-cv-518-jdp are DENIED. O'Grady's motions for extensions of time, Dkt. 298 and Dkt. 313 in 18-cv-368-jdp; Dkt. 214 and Dkt. 229 in 18-cv-582-jdp; Dkt. 111 and Dkt. 125 in 19 -cv-515-jdp; and Dkt. 263 and Dkt. 282 in 19-cv-518-jdp are DENIED. O'Grady's motion for relief from sanctions, Dkt. 273 in 19-cv-518-jdp, is DENIED. Defendants' motions for sanctions, Dkt. 306 and Dkt. 316 in 18-cv-368-jdp; Dkt. 222 a nd Dkt. 232 in 18-cv-582-jdp; Dkt. 118 and Dkt. 131 in 19-cv-515-jdp; Dkt. 269 and Dkt. 286 in 19-cv-518-jdp are DENIED. O'Grady may not file any motion, pleading, or other document in this court that exceeds five pages, including attachments, u nless he receives permission from the court to do so. O'Grady also may not serve any pleadings, motions, or other documents on an opposing party in any ongoing or future litigation in this court unless he has received permission from the court to do so. Signed by District Judge James D. Peterson on 2/9/2021. (lam),(ps)
November 12, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 279 JUDGMENT entered in favor of Defendants dismissing this case. Associated Cases: 3:18-cv-00368-jdp, 3:18-cv-00582-jdp (lam),(ps)
August 5, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 226 ORDER denying defendants' motions to dismiss under Fed. R. Civ. P. 37(b)(2), Dkt. 207 in 18-cv-368-jdp; Dkt. 122 in 18-cv-582-jdp; Dkt. 52 in 19-cv-515-jdp; Dkt. 170 in 19-cv-518-jdp. Plaintiff Michael O'Grady's motion to compel d iscovery from Mark Hazelbaker, Dkt. 223 in 18-cv-368-jdp and Dkt. 138 in 18-cv-582-jdp are DENIED. O'Grady must provide organized and clear discovery responses to defendants, as forth above, by August 20, 2020. If he fails to do so, I will dismiss these cases under Rule 37(b)(2) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. Signed by District Judge James D. Peterson on 8/5/2020. (jef),(ps)
July 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 222 ORDER granting defendants' motions to dismiss under Fed. R. Civ. P. 37(b)(2), Dkt. 191 and Dkt. 194 in 18-cv-368-jdp; Dkt. 106 and Dkt. 109 in 18-cv-582-jdp; Dkt. 135, Dkt. 140, Dkt. 143, Dkt. 147, and Dkt. 150 in 19-cv-518-jdp. The claims bro ught by plaintiffs Crystal Thom, David Thom, Raymond Boyle, Robert Wentworth, and William Cadwallader in these three cases are DISMISSED with prejudice under Fed. R. Civ. P. 37(b)(2). The caption shall be amended to remove these plaintiffs from these three cases. Defendants' motions under Fed. R. Civ. P. 11, Dkt. 200 in 18-cv-368-jdp; Dkt. 115 in 18-cv-582-jdp; Dkt. 157 in 19-cv-518-jdp, are DENIED. Plaintiffs Crystal Thom and David Thom's motions to amend the complaints, Dkt, 20 5 in 18-cv-368-jdp; Dkt. 120 in 18-cv-582-jdp; Dkt. 164 in 19-cv-518-jdp, are DENIED.Plaintiff Raymond Boyle's motions to deny sanctions, Dkt. 156 and Dkt. 169 in 19-cv-518-jdp, are DENIED. Signed by District Judge James D. Peterson on 7/23/2020. (jef),(ps)
June 19, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 198 ORDER that plaintiffs' motion for additional time to respond to defendants' discovery requests, Dkt. 189 in 18-cv-368-jdp; Dkt. 104 in 18-cv-582-jdp; Dkt. 48 in 19-cv-515-jdp; Dkt. 134 in 18-cv-518-jdp, is denied. Plaintiff' s motion for reconsideration of the sanctions order, Dkt. 130 in 18-cv-518-jdp, is denied.The motion for sanctions filed by defendants Columbia County, Portage Community Schools, Vern Gove, Joseph Ruf, Mathew Foster, Charles Poches, Mark Smit, B enjamin Oetzman, Alexander Agnew, Dennis Richards, Max Jenatscheck, Charles Church, and the Portage Community Schools, Dkt. 120 , is granted. Plaintiffs Michael O'Grady, Raymond Boyle, Robert Wentworth, Crystal Thom, David Thom, and William Cad wallader must pay these defendants $1,000.00 by July 17, 2020 as a sanction for plaintiffs' frivolous motion to disqualify counsel.The motion for sanctions filed by defendants City of Portage and Shawn Murphy, Dkt. 121 , is granted. Pla intiffs Michael O'Grady, Raymond Boyle, Robert Wentworth, Crystal Thom, David Thom, and William Cadwallader must pay these defendants $1,000.00 by July 17, 2020 as a sanction for plaintiffs' frivolous motion to disqualify counsel. Signed by District Judge James D. Peterson on 6/19/2020. (rks),(ps) (Main Document 113 replaced on 6/19/2020) (nln). Modified on 6/19/2020 to correct typo. (nln).
May 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 182 ORDER Plaintiffs' motion to disqualify counsel in 18-cv-518-jdp, Dkt. 25 , is DENIED. Plaintiff Raymond Boyle's motion for an extension of time to respond to the motion for sanctions, Dkt. 94 , is GRANTED. Defendants' motions for sanctions in 18-cv-518-jdp, Dkt. 56 and Dkt. 59 , are GRANTED. Defendants may have until May 29, 2020, to submit an itemized statement of the fees and costs incurred in responding to plaintiffs' motion to disqualify counsel and in prepar ing their motions for sanctions. Plaintiffs may have until June 5, 2020 to file a brief in opposition, solely addressing the amount of costs and fees requested by defendants. The motions to compel discovery from plaintiffs Michael O'Grady, David Thom, Crystal Thom, Raymond Boyle, William Cadwallader, and Robert Wentworth filed by the Portage defendants, Dkt. 141 ; Dkt. 147 ; Dkt. 154 in 18-cv-368-jdp; Dkt. 56 ; Dkt. 62 ; Dkt. 69 in 18-cv-582-jdp; Dkt. 27 in 19-cv-515-jdp; Dkt. 38 ; Dkt. 42 ; Dkt. 46 ; Dkt. 51 ; Dkt. 64 ; Dkt. 68 in 19-cv-518-jdp, Dkt. 33 in 19-cv-516-jdp; Dkt. 26 in 19-cv-517-jdp, are GRANTED. Plaintiffs may have until May 27, 2020 to supplement their responses to defendants' discov ery requests. Defendants' motion for a protective order, Dkt. 176 in 18-cv-368; Dkt. 91 in 18-cv-582-jdp; Dkt. 38 in 19-cv-515-jdp; Dkt. 109 in 19-cv-518-jdp; Dkt. 52 in 19-cv-516-jdp; Dkt. 40 in 19-cv-517-jdp, is GRANTED IN PART and DENIED IN PART. Signed by District Judge James D. Peterson on 5/21/2020. (rks),(ps)
January 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 135 ORDER granting the motion to dismiss filed by defendants Daniel Garrigan, Kenneth Manthey, Jason Stenberg, Robert Bagnell, Keith Klafke, Benjamin Neumann, Peter Warning, Anthony Brauner, Cory Miller, and Michael Schutz, Dkt. 120 in 18-cv-368-jdp. Pl aintiffs' claims against these defendants are DISMISSED. Defendant Scott Klicko's motion to dismiss, Dkt. 117 in 18-cv-368-jdp, is GRANTED. Plaintiffs' claims against Klicko are DISMISSED. The motion to dismiss filed by defendan ts Alexander Agnew, Gregory Bisch, David Clark, Matthew Foster, Peter Hibner, Robin Kvalo, Brad Meixner, Cory Miller, Brian Noll, Benjamin Oetzman, Charles Poches, Mark Smit, Dkt. 122 in 18-cv-368-jdp, is GRANTED IN PART and DENIED IN PART. The motio n is GRANTED as to plaintiffs' Fifth Amendment due process claims, plaintiffs' claims on behalf of non-parties, and counts 4 and 8. The motion is DENIED in all other respects. The motion to dismiss filed by defendants City of Portage, Peter Warning, Keith Klafke, Jason Stenberg, and Daniel Garrigan, Dkt. 41 in 18-cv-582-jdp, is GRANTED IN PART and DENIED IN PART. The motion is GRANTED as to plaintiffs' claims on behalf of non-parties and claim that defendant Klafke failed to protect plaintiff Michael O'Grady from an assault by Brad Meixner. The motion is DENIED in all other respects. The motion to dismiss filed by defendants City of Portage, Dawn Wilcox, Marie Moe, and Kevin Todryk, Dkt. 13 in 19-cv-515-jdp, is DENIED as moot. The motion to dismiss filed by defendants City of Portage and Shawn Murphy, Dkt. 12 in 19-cv-518-jdp, is DENIED as moot. Case numbers 18-cv-368-jdp and 18-cv-582-jdp are CONSOLIDATED and will proceed under case number 18-cv-368-jdp. Signed by District Judge James D. Peterson on 1/27/2020. (jef),(ps)
July 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 116 ORDER that the amended complaint at Dkt. 104 is the operative pleading in this case. Defendants may have until August 6, 2019 to file an answer to the amended complaint.The caption is AMENDED to remove William Cadwallader, Robert Wentworth, and Raymond Boyle as plaintiffs and Susan Conner, Shawn Murphy, Kevin Todryk, Peter Bartaczewicz, Dawn Wilcox, Marie Moe, Roger Brandner, Joseph Ruf, Jordan Haueter, Leda Wagner, Douglas Jarzynski, Michael Haverley, Terri Pulvermacher, Max Jenanaschet, Thomas M. Drury, Charles Miller, Kathryn E. Miller, Robert Becker, Charles Church, and Mark Hazelbaker as defendants. Signed by District Judge James D. Peterson on 7/23/2019. (jef),(ps)
June 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 112 ORDER that Plaintiffs' motions regarding documents, extensions of time, and leave to file amended complaints, Dkts. 101 , 102 , 103 , 104 , 105 , 106 , 107 , 109 , and 110 , are DENIED. Plaintiffs may have until July 9, 2019, to respond to this order as directed in the opinion above. If plaintiffs do not respond by July 9, I will dismiss this case for failure to comply with a court order. Signed by District Judge James D. Peterson on 6/26/2019. (rks),(ps)
March 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 100 ORDER granting plaintiffs' motion for leave to file an amended complaint, Dkt. 63 . Defendants' motions to dismiss, Dkt. 58 and Dkt. 76 , are GRANTED IN PART and DENIED IN PART. The motion is GRANTED with respect to Count 4, Count 5, Count 9, the portion of Count 7 relating to the school district's student fundraising policy, and plaintiffs' request that the court empanel a grand jury. The motion is DENIED in all other respects. Plaintiffs' remaining claims are DISMISSED under Federal Rule of Civil Procedures 8 and 20. Plaintiffs may have until April 15, 2019, to respond to this order as directed Signed by District Judge James D. Peterson on 3/25/2019. (jef),(ps)
July 3, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 61 ORDER denying plaintiff Michael O'Grady's 50 motion to refer evidence of criminal wrongdoing; denying plaintiffs O'Grady and Raymond Boyle's 52 motion for preliminary injunctive relief. Plaintiff O'Grady may have until July 17, 2018, to respond to this order, explaining whether he has paid off the filing fees that are the subject of the 2012 court of appeals' sanction order. Signed by District Judge James D. Peterson on 7/3/2018. (jef),(ps)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Wisconsin Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Thom, David et al v. Garrigan, Daniel et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: David Thom
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Crystel Thom
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: William Cadwallader
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert L. Wentworth
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Raymond Boyle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael O'Grady
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Daniel Garrigan
Represented By: Danielle Elizabeth Baudhuin
Represented By: Lori Marie Lubinsky
Represented By: Elizabeth C. Stephens
Represented By: Meg Vergeront
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Charles Poches
Represented By: Danielle Elizabeth Baudhuin
Represented By: Lori Marie Lubinsky
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Matthew Foster
Represented By: Danielle Elizabeth Baudhuin
Represented By: Lori Marie Lubinsky
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Peter Hibner
Represented By: Danielle Elizabeth Baudhuin
Represented By: Lori Marie Lubinsky
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robin Kvalo
Represented By: Danielle Elizabeth Baudhuin
Represented By: Lori Marie Lubinsky
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brad Meixner
Represented By: Danielle Elizabeth Baudhuin
Represented By: Lori Marie Lubinsky
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Susan Conner
Represented By: Danielle Elizabeth Baudhuin
Represented By: Lori Marie Lubinsky
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Shawn Murphy
Represented By: Elizabeth C. Stephens
Represented By: Meg Vergeront
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kenneth Manthey
Represented By: Elizabeth C. Stephens
Represented By: Meg Vergeront
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jason Stenberg
Represented By: Elizabeth C. Stephens
Represented By: Meg Vergeront
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robert Bagnell
Represented By: Elizabeth C. Stephens
Represented By: Meg Vergeront
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Keith Klafke
Represented By: Elizabeth C. Stephens
Represented By: Meg Vergeront
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Benjamin Neumann
Represented By: Elizabeth C. Stephens
Represented By: Meg Vergeront
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kevin Todryk
Represented By: Elizabeth C. Stephens
Represented By: Meg Vergeront
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Peter Warning
Represented By: Elizabeth C. Stephens
Represented By: Meg Vergeront
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Peter Bartaczewicz
Represented By: Elizabeth C. Stephens
Represented By: Meg Vergeront
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Anthony Brauner
Represented By: Elizabeth C. Stephens
Represented By: Meg Vergeront
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael Schulz
Represented By: Elizabeth C. Stephens
Represented By: Meg Vergeront
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dawn Wilcox
Represented By: Elizabeth C. Stephens
Represented By: Meg Vergeront
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Marie Moe
Represented By: Elizabeth C. Stephens
Represented By: Meg Vergeront
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Scott Klicko
Represented By: Elizabeth C. Stephens
Represented By: Meg Vergeront
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brian Noll
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Roger Brandner
Represented By: Danielle Elizabeth Baudhuin
Represented By: Lori Marie Lubinsky
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Joseph Ruf
Represented By: Danielle Elizabeth Baudhuin
Represented By: Lori Marie Lubinsky
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jordan Haueter
Represented By: Danielle Elizabeth Baudhuin
Represented By: Lori Marie Lubinsky
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Leda Wagner
Represented By: Danielle Elizabeth Baudhuin
Represented By: Lori Marie Lubinsky
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Douglas Jarzynski
Represented By: Danielle Elizabeth Baudhuin
Represented By: Lori Marie Lubinsky
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David Clark
Represented By: Danielle Elizabeth Baudhuin
Represented By: Lori Marie Lubinsky
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael Haverley
Represented By: Danielle Elizabeth Baudhuin
Represented By: Lori Marie Lubinsky
Represented By: Meg Vergeront
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mark Smit
Represented By: Danielle Elizabeth Baudhuin
Represented By: Lori Marie Lubinsky
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alexander Agnew
Represented By: Danielle Elizabeth Baudhuin
Represented By: Lori Marie Lubinsky
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Benjamin Oetzman
Represented By: Danielle Elizabeth Baudhuin
Represented By: Lori Marie Lubinsky
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Terri Pulvermacher
Represented By: Danielle Elizabeth Baudhuin
Represented By: Lori Marie Lubinsky
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Max Jenanaschet
Represented By: Danielle Elizabeth Baudhuin
Represented By: Lori Marie Lubinsky
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cory Miller
Represented By: Danielle Elizabeth Baudhuin
Represented By: Lori Marie Lubinsky
Represented By: Meg Vergeront
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gregory Bisch
Represented By: Danielle Elizabeth Baudhuin
Represented By: Lori Marie Lubinsky
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Thomas M. Drury
Represented By: Elizabeth C. Stephens
Represented By: Meg Vergeront
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Charles Miller
Represented By: Elizabeth C. Stephens
Represented By: Meg Vergeront
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kathryn E. Miller
Represented By: Elizabeth C. Stephens
Represented By: Meg Vergeront
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robert Becker
Represented By: Elizabeth C. Stephens
Represented By: Meg Vergeront
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?