Thrivent Financial for Lutherans v. Wiskerchen, Nancy et al
Plaintiff: Thrivent Financial for Lutherans
Defendant: Nancy J. Wiskerchen, S. L., St. Mary's University of Minnesota and Jordan Lisack
Case Number: 3:2018cv00491
Filed: June 26, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Wisconsin
Office: Madison Office
County: Marathon
Presiding Judge: Stephen L Crocker
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1335
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 9, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 9, 2018 Filing 5 Waiver of Service Returned Executed by Defendant St. Mary's University of Minnesota. St. Mary's University of Minnesota waiver sent on 6/26/2018, answer due 8/27/2018. (Katt, Christina) Modified on 8/10/2018: Captioned for the Eastern District. (lak)
August 9, 2018 Filing 4 Waiver of Service Returned Executed by Defendant S. L. S. L. waiver sent on 6/26/2018, answer due 8/27/2018. (Katt, Christina) Modified on 8/10/2018: Captioned for the Eastern District. (lak)
August 9, 2018 Filing 3 Waiver of Service Returned Executed by Defendant Nancy J. Wiskerchen. Nancy J. Wiskerchen waiver sent on 6/26/2018, answer due 8/27/2018. (Katt, Christina) Modified on 8/10/2018: Captioned for the Eastern District. (lak)
August 9, 2018 Filing 2 Waiver of Service Returned Executed by Defendant Jordan Lisack. Jordan Lisack waiver sent on 6/26/2018, answer due 8/27/2018. (Katt, Christina) Modified on 8/10/2018: Captioned for the Eastern District. (lak)
August 9, 2018 Action Requested: Counsel for plaintiff requested to promptly file proof of service. (voc)
June 27, 2018 Standard attachments for Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker required to be served on all parties with summons or waiver of service: #Corporate Disclosure Statement, #Order Regarding Assignment of Cases, #Notice of Assignment to a Magistrate Judge and Consent/Request for Reassignment, #Order on Dispositive Motions. (voc)
June 27, 2018 Case randomly assigned to Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker. (voc)
June 26, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT for Interpleader Relief against All Defendants. Service to be completed by Waiver of Service of Summons. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0758-2270237.), filed by Thrivent Financial for Lutherans. (Attachments: #1 JS-44 Civil Cover Sheet) (Katt, Christina) Modified on 6/27/2018: Case number. (lak)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Wisconsin Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Thrivent Financial for Lutherans v. Wiskerchen, Nancy et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nancy J. Wiskerchen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: S. L.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: St. Mary's University of Minnesota
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jordan Lisack
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Thrivent Financial for Lutherans
Represented By: Christina Anne Katt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?