Poff, Jeff v. Waterman, J. et al
Plaintiff: Jeff Poff
Defendant: Jane Doe, Nurse J. Waterman, L. Alsum, John Doe, Jane Doe 2, John Doe 2, NP McArdle, Sandra McArdle and Jolinda Waterman
Undetermined: WSPF Prison Facility
Case Number: 3:2018cv00563
Filed: July 19, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Wisconsin
Office: Madison Office
County: Out of State
Presiding Judge: Barbara B Crabb
Referring Judge: Stephen L Crocker
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 29, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 27, 2018 Filing 16 Summons Issued as to Sandra McArdle. Summons forwarded to USMS for service. (nln),(ps)
August 27, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER Directing USMS to Serve Complaint on Sandra McArdle. Signed by Magistrate Judge Peter A. Oppeneer on 8/27/2018. (nln),(ps)
August 15, 2018 Filing 14 Acceptance of Service by DOJ on behalf of Defendant J. Waterman. Service not accepted on behalf of Sandra Ardle, Jane Doe #1, Jane Doe #2, Jane Doe #3, Jane Doe #4, John Doe #1, John Doe #2. (Carson, Gesina),(ps)
August 15, 2018 Filing 13 Notice of Appearance filed by Gesina S. Carson for Defendant J. Waterman, (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service) (Carson, Gesina),(ps)
August 10, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER on Leave to Proceed: Plaintiff granted leave to proceed against Defendants J. Waterman, NP McArdle John Does # 1, 2 and Jane Does # 1, 2, 3, and 4. Leave to proceed denied and case dismissed against L. Alsum. Materials delivered to DOJ for acceptance of service. Signed by District Judge Barbara B. Crabb on 8/10/2018. (jef),(ps)
July 19, 2018 PRLA Screening. (jef),(ps)
July 19, 2018 Case randomly assigned to District Judge Barbara B. Crabb. (jef),(ps)
July 19, 2018 Filing 11 Case transferred in from District of Wisconsin Eastern; Case Number 2:18-cv-00442. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received. (lak)
July 19, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 10 Order to Transfer Case to Western District of WI Pursuant to 28 USC 1406(a) signed by Magistrate Judge David E Jones on 7/19/18. (cc: all counsel, IT Dept - via US Mail to Plaintiff)(kah) Modified on 7/19/2018 (kah). [Transferred from Wisconsin Eastern on 7/19/2018.]
May 16, 2018 Filing 9 REQUEST by Jeff Poff for confirmation that filing fee has been paid. (mac) (Docket mailed to Plaintiff) Modified on 5/17/2018 (kah). [Transferred from Wisconsin Eastern on 7/19/2018.]
April 30, 2018 INITIAL PARTIAL FILING FEE Received: $21.73, receipt number MK4689-071567; the payment of all future filing fees will be maintained by the financial department. (lls) [Transferred from Wisconsin Eastern on 7/19/2018.]
April 24, 2018 Filing 8 MOTION for Extension of Time to pay filing fee by Jeff Poff. (mac) [Transferred from Wisconsin Eastern on 7/19/2018.]
April 19, 2018 Filing 7 MOTION for Leave to File Amended Complaint by Jeff Poff. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Amended Complaint)(lh) Modified on 4/20/2018 (kah). [Transferred from Wisconsin Eastern on 7/19/2018.]
April 2, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER that on or before 4/23/18 plaintiff shall forward to the Clerk of Court the sum of $ 21.73 as an initial partial filing fee in this action signed by Magistrate Judge David E Jones on 4/2/18. (cc: all counsel - via US Mail to Plaintiff)(kah) [Transferred from Wisconsin Eastern on 7/19/2018.]
April 2, 2018 Filing 5 Prisoner Trust Fund Account Statement by Jeff Poff. (mac) [Transferred from Wisconsin Eastern on 7/19/2018.]
April 2, 2018 Filing 4 CONSENT to Jurisdiction by US Magistrate Judge by Jeff Poff. (mac) [Transferred from Wisconsin Eastern on 7/19/2018.]
March 20, 2018 Filing 3 LETTER from the clerk to Jeff Poff re Consent/Refusal to Magistrate Judge Jones and requesting that the consent/refusal/request to proceed without paying filing fee/trust account forms be filed within 21 days (lh) [Transferred from Wisconsin Eastern on 7/19/2018.]
March 20, 2018 Filing 2 MOTION for Order to pay initial partial filing fee from release account by Jeff Poff. (lh) [Transferred from Wisconsin Eastern on 7/19/2018.]
March 20, 2018 Filing 1 PRISONER COMPLAINT with Jury Demand filed against All Defendants by Jeff Poff. (Attachments: #1 Cover letter)(lh) [Transferred from Wisconsin Eastern on 7/19/2018.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Wisconsin Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Poff, Jeff v. Waterman, J. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jane Doe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nurse J. Waterman
Represented By: Corey Francis Finkelmeyer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: L. Alsum
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jane Doe 2
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe 2
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NP McArdle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sandra McArdle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jolinda Waterman
Represented By: Corey Francis Finkelmeyer
Represented By: Gesina S. Carson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jeff Poff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Undetermined: WSPF Prison Facility
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?