Gibson, Johnny v. Boughton, Gary et al

Plaintiff: Johnny Gibson
Defendant: Gary Boughton, Michael J. Sherman, Logen J. Lathrop, Lesa K. Novinska and Sandra Mumm
Undetermined: Green Bay Correctional Institution
Case Number: 3:2018cv00593
Filed: August 2, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Wisconsin
Office: Madison Office
County: Racine
Presiding Judge: William M Conley
Referring Judge: Stephen L Crocker
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 13, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 14, 2018 Filing 5 Notice from the Clerk regarding the Prisoner E-Filing Program (Attachments: #1 Prisoner E-Filing Information Packet) (elc),(ps)
September 13, 2018 Filing 4 Notice of Change of Address to Green Bay Correctional Institution by Plaintiff Johnny Gibson. (Attachments: #1 Envelope) (jef),(ps)
August 7, 2018 Filing 3 Record from Dane County Circuit Court. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Transmittal, #2 State Court Documents - Notice of Removal, Summons and Complaint, etc.) (nln),(ps)
August 2, 2018 Judge update in case. Case now assigned to District Judge William M. Conley and Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker. (nln),(ps)
August 2, 2018 Filing 2 Motion for Screening of Complaint and Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint by Defendants Gary Boughton, Logen J. Lathrop, Sandra Mumm, Lesa K. Novinska, Michael J. Sherman. (Peacock, Ann),(ps)
August 2, 2018 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL and Petition For Removal from Dane County Circuit Court, case number 18C0932, ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0758-2290774), filed by Lesa K. Novinska, Logen J. Lathrop, Michael J. Sherman, Sandra Mumm, Gary Boughton, (Attachments: #1 Exhibit - Summons and Complaint with Attachments, #2 JS-44 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Certificate of Service) (Peacock, Ann),(ps) Modified on 8/3/2018. (lak)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Wisconsin Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Gibson, Johnny v. Boughton, Gary et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gary Boughton
Represented By: Ann M. Peacock
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael J. Sherman
Represented By: Ann M. Peacock
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Logen J. Lathrop
Represented By: Ann M. Peacock
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lesa K. Novinska
Represented By: Ann M. Peacock
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sandra Mumm
Represented By: Ann M. Peacock
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Johnny Gibson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Undetermined: Green Bay Correctional Institution
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?