Nawrocki, Mary Ann v. Foster, Rory

Plaintiff: Mary Ann (Shaw) Nawrocki
Defendant: Rory Foster
Case Number: 3:2018cv00601
Filed: August 6, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Wisconsin
Office: Madison Office
County: Dane
Presiding Judge: Stephen L Crocker
Referring Judge: James D Peterson
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 16, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 1, 2018 Filing 6 Notice of Change of Address by Plaintiff Mary Ann (Shaw) Nawrocki. (Attachments: #1 Envelope) (nln),(ps)
August 21, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER taking complaint taken under advisement for screening. Signed by Magistrate Judge Peter A. Oppeneer on 8/21/2018. (elc),(ps)
August 20, 2018 Filing 4 Submissions re: Bi-State Development by Plaintiff Mary Ann (Shaw) Nawrocki. (Attachments: #1 Cover Page, #2 Envelope) (elc),(ps)
August 20, 2018 Filing 3 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Plaintiff Mary Ann (Shaw) Nawrocki. (Attachments: #1 Cover Page, #2 Envelope) (elc),(ps)
August 6, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER that plaintiff shall submit either the $400 filing fee or a motion for leave to proceed without prepayment by 8/28/2018. Signed by Magistrate Judge Peter A. Oppeneer on 8/6/2018. (elc),(ps)
August 6, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Rory Foster, filed by Mary Ann (Shaw) Nawrocki. (Case non-randomly assigned to District Judge James D. Peterson) (Attachments: #1 Envelope) (elc)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Wisconsin Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Nawrocki, Mary Ann v. Foster, Rory
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rory Foster
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mary Ann (Shaw) Nawrocki
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?