Holcomb, Tyrice v. Dart, Todd et al

Plaintiff: Tyrice Holcomb
Defendant: Todd Dart, Luis Franca, The Town of Madison Police Department and The State of Wisconsin
Case Number: 3:2018cv00608
Filed: August 6, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Wisconsin
Office: Madison Office
County: Out of State
Presiding Judge: Barbara B Crabb
Referring Judge: Stephen L Crocker
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 24, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 24, 2018 Filing 6 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Plaintiff Tyrice Holcomb. (nln),(ps)
September 24, 2018 Filing 5 Proposed AMENDED COMPLAINT by Plaintiff Tyrice Holcomb. (Attachments: #1 Envelope) (nln),(ps)
September 10, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER Dismissing #1 Complaint pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 8. Amended complaint due 9/27/2018. Signed by District Judge Barbara B. Crabb on 9/10/2018. (elc),(ps)
August 9, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER on ifp request: Complaint taken under advisement for screening. Signed by Magistrate Judge Peter A. Oppeneer on 8/9/2018. (jef),(ps)
August 6, 2018 Filing 2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Plaintiff Tyrice Holcomb. (jef),(ps)
August 6, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Tyrice Holcomb. (Case randomly assigned to District Judge Barbara B. Crabb.) (Attachments: #1 Envelope) (jef) Note, there was no page 3 enclosed. (jef)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Wisconsin Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Holcomb, Tyrice v. Dart, Todd et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Todd Dart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Luis Franca
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Town of Madison Police Department
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The State of Wisconsin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tyrice Holcomb
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?