Symbology Innovations LLC v. Johnson Health Tech North America, Inc.

Plaintiff: Symbology Innovations LLC
Defendant: Johnson Health Tech North America, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2018cv00687
Filed: August 17, 2018
Court: Wisconsin Western District Court
Office: Madison Office
County: Dane
0 Judge: William M Conley
1 Judge: Stephen L Crocker
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 35:271
Jury Demanded By: Both

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 3, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed#Document Text
October 3, 2018 11 Reply to Counterclaim by Counter Defendant Symbology Innovations LLC. (Torres, Eugenio) Modified on 10/4/2018. (lak)
September 28, 2018 10 Notice of Appearance filed by Gilbert Ozioma Nwaopara for Defendant Johnson Health Tech North America, Inc., Counter Claimant Johnson Health Tech North America, Inc. (Nwaopara, Gilbert)
September 20, 2018 Set Pretrial Conference: Telephone Pretrial Conference set for 10/25/2018 at 1:00 PM before Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker. Counsel for Plaintiff responsible for setting up the call to chambers at (608) 264-5153. #Standing Order Governing Preliminary Pretrial Conference attached. (arw)
September 17, 2018 9 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Defendant Johnson Health Tech North America, Inc., (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Corporate Parent Information) (Scheller, John) Modified on 9/19/2018: Added exhibit description. (lak)
September 17, 2018 8 ANSWER with Jury Demand, COUNTERCLAIM to Complaint for Patent Infringement against Symbology Innovations LLC by Defendant Johnson Health Tech North America, Inc. (Scheller, John) Modified on 9/19/2018. (lak)
September 17, 2018 7 Notice of Appearance filed by John C. Scheller for Defendant Johnson Health Tech North America, Inc. (Scheller, John)
September 12, 2018 6 Affidavit of Service by Plaintiff. Johnson Health Tech North America, Inc. served on 8/27/2018, answer due 9/17/2018. (Torres, Eugenio)
August 17, 2018 5 Report on Filing of Patent or Trademark Action. Copy provided to the US Patent and Trademark Office electronically. (voc)
August 17, 2018 4 Summons Issued as to Johnson Health Tech North America, Inc. (voc)
August 17, 2018 Standard attachments for Judge William M. Conley required to be served on all parties with summons or waiver of service: # NORTC, #Corporate Disclosure Statement. (voc)
August 17, 2018 Case randomly assigned to District Judge William M. Conley and Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker. (voc)
August 17, 2018 3 Notice of Appearance filed by Jean G. Vidal for Plaintiff Symbology Innovations LLC. (Vidal, Jean)
August 17, 2018 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Plaintiff Symbology Innovations LLC. (Torres, Eugenio)
August 17, 2018 1 PATENT COMPLAINT against Johnson Health Tech North America, Inc. ( Filing fee $400, receipt number 0758-2301410) filed by Symbology Innovations LLC. PATENTS AT ISSUE: Patent # 8,424,752 B2, issued 04/23/2013, held by Symbology Innovations, LLC; Patent # 8,651,369 B2, issued 02/18/2014, held by Symbology Innovations, LLC; Patent # 8,936,190 B2, issued 01/20/2015, held by Symbology Innovations, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - US Patent No. 8424752 B2, #2 Exhibit B - US Patent No. 8651369 B2, #3 Exhibit C - US Patent No. 8936190 B2, #4 JS-44 Civil Cover Sheet, #5 Summons as to Johnson Health Tech North America, Inc., #6 Report on Filing Patent/Trademark Action) (Torres, Eugenio) Modified on 8/20/2018. (arw)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Wisconsin Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Symbology Innovations LLC v. Johnson Health Tech North America, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Symbology Innovations LLC
Represented By: Eugenio J. Torres
Represented By: Jean G. Vidal
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Johnson Health Tech North America, Inc.
Represented By: John C. Scheller
Represented By: Gilbert Ozioma Nwaopara
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?