Bruzek, Jasen et al v. Husky Energy Inc. et al

Plaintiff: Jasen Bruzek, Hope Koplin and Neil Miller
Defendant: Superior Refining Company LLC and Husky Energy Inc.
Case Number: 3:2018cv00697
Filed: August 20, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Wisconsin
Office: Madison Office
County: Douglas
Presiding Judge: William M Conley
Referring Judge: Stephen L Crocker
Nature of Suit: Personal Property: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 13, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 18, 2018 Filing 12 Joint Stipulation to Extend Time to Answer or Otherwise Plead and Setting Briefing Schedule by Plaintiffs Jasen Bruzek, Hope Koplin, Neil Miller. (Rudd, John)
September 17, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ** TEXT ONLY ORDER **ORDER granting #10 Joint Stipulation to Extend Time to Answer or Otherwise Plead. Defendants Husky Energy Inc., Superior Refining Company LLC answer due 10/19/2018. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker on 9/17/2018. (arw)
September 17, 2018 Filing 10 Stipulation to Extend Time to Answer or Otherwise Plead by Defendants Husky Energy Inc., Superior Refining Company LLC. (Olson, Joseph) Modified on 9/19/2018. (lak)
September 17, 2018 Filing 9 Waiver of Service Returned Executed by Defendant Husky Energy Inc. Husky Energy Inc., waiver sent on 9/12/2018, answer due 11/13/2018. (Olson, Joseph)
September 17, 2018 Filing 8 Notice of Appearance filed by Joseph Louis Olson for Defendants Husky Energy Inc., Superior Refining Company LLC. (Olson, Joseph)
September 7, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ** TEXT ONLY ORDER **ORDER granting #5 Motion to Admit Charles Toomajian, III Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Magistrate Judge Peter A. Oppeneer on 9/7/2018. (lak)
September 7, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ** TEXT ONLY ORDER **ORDER granting #4 Motion to Admit June P. Hoidal Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Magistrate Judge Peter A. Oppeneer on 9/7/2018. (lak)
September 6, 2018 Filing 5 Motion to Admit Charles Toomajian, III Pro Hac Vice. ( Pro Hac Vice fee $ 100 receipt number 0758-2313848.) by Plaintiffs Jasen Bruzek, Hope Koplin, Neil Miller. Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker. (Toomajian, Charles)
September 6, 2018 Filing 4 Motion to Admit June P. Hoidal Pro Hac Vice. ( Pro Hac Vice fee $ 100 receipt number 0758-2313836.) by Plaintiffs Jasen Bruzek, Hope Koplin, Neil Miller. Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker. (Hoidal, June)
September 5, 2018 Filing 3 Summons Returned Executed. Superior Refining Company LLC served on 8/29/2018, answer due 9/19/2018. (Bloodgood, Patricia)
August 22, 2018 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to Husky Energy Inc. and Superior Refining Company LLC. (Attachments: #1 Summons - Superior Refining Company LLC) (arw)
August 22, 2018 Standard attachments for District Judge William M. Conley required to be served on all parties with summons or waiver of service: # NORTC, #Corporate Disclosure Statement. (arw)
August 22, 2018 Case randomly assigned to District Judge William M. Conley and Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker. (arw)
August 20, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Husky Energy Inc., Superior Refining Company LLC (Filing fee $400, receipt number 0758-2303441) filed by Hope Koplin, Jasen Bruzek, Neil Miller. (Attachments: #1 JS-44 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons - Husky Energy Inc., #3 Summons - Superior Refining Company LLC) (Bloodgood, Patricia)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Wisconsin Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bruzek, Jasen et al v. Husky Energy Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Superior Refining Company LLC
Represented By: Joseph Louis Olson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Husky Energy Inc.
Represented By: Joseph Louis Olson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jasen Bruzek
Represented By: John Gordon Rudd, Jr.
Represented By: Patricia A Bloodgood
Represented By: June P. Hoidal
Represented By: Charles Toomajian, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Hope Koplin
Represented By: John Gordon Rudd, Jr.
Represented By: Patricia A Bloodgood
Represented By: June P. Hoidal
Represented By: Charles Toomajian, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Neil Miller
Represented By: John Gordon Rudd, Jr.
Represented By: Patricia A Bloodgood
Represented By: June P. Hoidal
Represented By: Charles Toomajian, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?