Doyle, Bryan v. Stachel, Christopher

Plaintiff: Bryan Robert Doyle
Defendant: Christopher Stachel
Case Number: 3:2018cv00736
Filed: September 5, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Wisconsin
Presiding Judge: Stephen L Crocker
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 26, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 26, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 9 Pretrial Conference Order - # Preliminary Pretrial Packet in cases assigned to District Judge Stephen L. Crocker attached. Amendments to Pleadings due 11/30/2018. Dispositive Motions due 6/3/2019. Settlement Letters due 10/31/2019. Motions in Limine due 11/8/2019. Response to Motion due 11/22/2019. Telephone Final Pretrial Conference set for 12/4/2019 at 03:00 PM before Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker. Counsel for Plaintiff responsible for setting up the call to chambers at (608) 264-5153. Jury Selection and Trial set for 12/9/2019 at 09:00 AM. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker on 10/25/18. (jat)
October 25, 2018 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker: Telephone Preliminary Pretrial Conference held on 10/25/2018 [:05] (skv)
October 22, 2018 Filing 8 Joint Discovery Plan. (Wolfgang, John)
October 4, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER Referring Case to Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker. Signed by District Judge James D. Peterson on 10/4/2018. (Attachments: #1 Consent - Plaintiff, #2 Consent - Defendant) (lak)
September 27, 2018 Set Telephone Conference: Telephone Pretrial Conference set for 10/25/2018 at 01:30 PM before Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker. Counsel for Plaintiff responsible for setting up the call to chambers at (608) 264-5153. [#Standing Order Governing Preliminary Pretrial Conference attached] (jat)
September 27, 2018 Filing 6 ANSWER by Defendant Christopher Stachel. (Wolfgang, John)
September 27, 2018 Filing 5 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Defendant Christopher Stachel. (Wolfgang, John)
September 27, 2018 Filing 4 Notice of Appearance filed by John A. Wolfgang for Defendant Christopher Stachel, (Attachments: #1 Cover Letter) (Wolfgang, John)
September 11, 2018 Filing 3 Affidavit of Service by Plaintiff. Christopher Stachel served on 9/10/2018, answer due 10/1/2018. (Gingras, Robert)
September 5, 2018 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to Christopher Stachel. (jat)
September 5, 2018 Standard attachments for Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker required to be served on all parties with summons or waiver of service: #Corporate Disclosure Statement, #Order Regarding Assignment of Cases, #Notice of Assignment to a Magistrate Judge and Consent/Request for Reassignment, #Order on Dispositive Motions. (jat)
September 5, 2018 Case randomly assigned to Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker. (jat)
September 5, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Christopher Stachel, ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0758-2312908.), filed by Bryan Robert Doyle, (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 JS-44 Civil Cover Sheet) (Gingras, Robert) Modified on 9/5/2018: Added jury demand, per complaint. (lak)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Wisconsin Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Doyle, Bryan v. Stachel, Christopher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bryan Robert Doyle
Represented By: Robert John Gingras
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Christopher Stachel
Represented By: John A. Wolfgang
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?