Mullens, Chad v. Adams County Government et al

Plaintiff: Chad Ernst Mullens
Defendant: Adams County, Adams County Government and Adams County Solid Waste Dept.
Case Number: 3:2018cv00808
Filed: September 28, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Wisconsin
Presiding Judge: William M Conley
Referring Judge: Stephen L Crocker
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 26, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 26, 2018 Set Telephone Pretrial Conference: Telephone Pretrial Conference set for 11/28/2018 at 02:30 PM before Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker. Plaintiff responsible for contacting the court at (608) 264-5153. Once plaintiff's call has been received, the court will then include counsel for defendant in the conference call. [#Notice Regarding the Telephone Preliminary Pretrial Conference attached] (nln),(ps)
October 26, 2018 Filing 13 Certificate of Service by Defendants Adams County Government, Adams County Solid Waste Dept. as to #12 Answer. (Jacobs, Jerilyn),(ps)
October 26, 2018 Filing 12 ANSWER by Defendants Adams County Government, Adams County Solid Waste Dept. (Jacobs, Jerilyn),(ps)
October 22, 2018 Filing 11 Letter from Plaintiff Chad Mullens enclosing copy of letters sent to Attorneys Jacobs and Dale providing copy of complaint. (Attachments: #1 Copy of letter to Attorney Jerilyn Jacobs, #2 Copy of letter to Attorney Mindy Dale, #3 Envelope) (nln),(ps)
October 17, 2018 Filing 10 Proof of service as to Adams County Government, et al, by Plaintiff Chad Mullens. (Attachments: #1 Proof of service as to Adams County Solid Waste Dept, #2 Envelope) (jef),(ps)
October 15, 2018 Filing 9 Certificate of Service by Defendants Adams County Government, Adams County Solid Waste Dept. as to #8 Notice of Appearance. (Dale, Mindy),(ps)
October 15, 2018 Filing 8 Notice of Appearance filed by Mindy Kay Dale for Defendants Adams County Government, Adams County Solid Waste Dept. (Dale, Mindy),(ps)
October 15, 2018 Filing 7 Certificate of Service by Defendants Adams County Government, Adams County Solid Waste Dept. as to #5 Notice of Appearance. (Jacobs, Jerilyn),(ps)
October 12, 2018 Filing 6 Disregard. To be refiled. Modified on 10/15/2018. (lak)
October 12, 2018 Filing 5 Notice of Appearance filed by Jerilyn Jacobs for Defendants Adams County Government, Adams County Solid Waste Dept. (Jacobs, Jerilyn),(ps)
October 9, 2018 Filing 4 Supplement to #2 Letter requesting assistance in recruiting counsel filed by Chad Ernst Mullens. (Attachments: #1 Attorneys, receipts) (jef),(ps)
October 2, 2018 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Adams County Government, Adams County Solid Waste Dept. Summonses forwarded to plaintiff for service. (Attachments: #1 Summons issued as to Adams County Solid Waste Dept., #2 Wis. Stat. 801.11) (nln).
September 28, 2018 Filing 2 Letter from Plaintiff Chad Ernst Mullens requesting assistance in recruiting counsel. (nln),(ps)
September 28, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Adams County Government, Adams County, filed by Chad Ernst Mullens. (Filing fee $400 receipt number 34690032901.) (Case randomly assigned to District Judge William M. Conley.) (Attachments: #1 Harassment Complaint Form, #2 Charge of Discrimination, #3 EEOC Dismissal and Notice of Rights) (nln)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Wisconsin Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Mullens, Chad v. Adams County Government et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Chad Ernst Mullens
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Adams County
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Adams County Government
Represented By: Jerilyn Jacobs
Represented By: Mindy Kay Dale
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Adams County Solid Waste Dept.
Represented By: Jerilyn Jacobs
Represented By: Mindy Kay Dale
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?