Cephus, Quintez v. Board of Regents of the University of Wisconsin System et al

Plaintiff: Quintez Cephus
Defendant: Cathy Trueba, Rebecca Blank, Lauren Hasselbacher and Board of Regents of the University of Wisconsin System
Case Number: 3:2018cv00832
Filed: October 9, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Wisconsin
Presiding Judge: William M Conley
Referring Judge: Stephen L Crocker
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 20:1681
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 21, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 21, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 34 ** TEXT ONLY ORDER **The court is in receipt of two motions by plaintiff (dkt. # #32 , #33 ), both of which are GRANTED. Plaintiff's motion for a preliminary injunction (dkt. #2 ) is DISMISSED without prejudice. The deadline for filing an amended complaint without leave of court is extended to January 30, 2019, and plaintiff's opposition to defendants' motion to dismiss is now due February 22, 2019; defendants' reply is due March 4, 2019. The November 26, 2018, telephonic conference is REMOVED from the court's calendar. Signed by District Judge William M. Conley on 11/21/2018. (jls)
November 20, 2018 Filing 33 Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to file Amended Complaint and Respond to Defendants' Motion to Dismiss by Plaintiff Quintez Cephus. Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order) (Bernstein, Stuart)
November 20, 2018 Filing 32 Notice of Withdrawal of Motion by Plaintiff Quintez Cephus re: #2 MOTION FOR PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION and Request for Expedited Consideration filed by Quintez Cephus. (Bernstein, Stuart)
November 13, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 31 ** TEXT ONLY ORDER ** Plaintiff's unopposed motion for extension of time to respond to defendants' motion to dismiss and for a court conference (dkt. #30 ) is GRANTED. The deadline for plaintiff's response to defendants' motion to dismiss is extended to November 30, 2018. The court will hold a telephonic conference on November 26, 2018, at 1:00 p.m. Plaintiff's counsel to establish call to Chambers at 608-264-5087. Signed by District Judge William M. Conley on 11/13/2018. (voc)
November 12, 2018 Filing 30 Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time for Plaintiff to Respond to Defendants' Motion to Dismiss and for a Court Conference by Plaintiff Quintez Cephus. Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order) (Bernstein, Stuart) Modified on 11/13/2018. (lak)
November 1, 2018 Per the Court's Text Order dated 10/17/2018, #21, Set/Reset Brief in Opposition Deadline as to #25 MOTION TO DISMISS by Defendants Rebecca Blank, Board of Regents of the University of Wisconsin System, Lauren Hasselbacher, Cathy Trueba . Brief in Opposition due 11/13/2018. (voc)
October 31, 2018 Filing 29 Affidavit of Tonya Schmidt filed by Defendants Rebecca Blank, Board of Regents of the University of Wisconsin System, Lauren Hasselbacher, Cathy Trueba re: #2 Motion for Preliminary Injunction. (Bensky, Anne)
October 31, 2018 Filing 28 Proposed Findings of Fact filed by Defendants Rebecca Blank, Board of Regents of the University of Wisconsin System, Lauren Hasselbacher, Cathy Trueba re: #2 Motion for Preliminary Injunction. (Bensky, Anne)
October 31, 2018 Filing 27 Response to Proposed Findings of Fact filed by Defendants Rebecca Blank, Board of Regents of the University of Wisconsin System, Lauren Hasselbacher, Cathy Trueba re: #2 Motion for Preliminary Injunction. (Bensky, Anne)
October 31, 2018 Filing 26 Combined Brief in Support of #25 Motion to Dismiss and Brief in Opposition re: #2 Motion for Preliminary Injunction by Defendants Rebecca Blank, Board of Regents of the University of Wisconsin System, Lauren Hasselbacher, Cathy Trueba. (Bensky, Anne) Modified on 11/1/2018: This is a multi-part document. (lak)
October 31, 2018 Filing 25 MOTION TO DISMISS by Defendants Rebecca Blank, Board of Regents of the University of Wisconsin System, Lauren Hasselbacher, Cathy Trueba. Brief in Opposition due 11/21/2018. Brief in Reply due 12/3/2018. (Bensky, Anne)
October 17, 2018 Minute Entry for proceedings held before District Judge William M. Conley: Telephone Status Conference held on 10/17/2018 [:20] (mfh)
October 17, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ** TEXT ONLY ORDER ** During today's telephonic conference on plaintiff Quintez Cephus's motion for preliminary injunction (dkt. #2 ), the court set the following briefing schedule: defendants' response to the motion and their planned motion to dismiss are due October 31, 2018; plaintiff's opposition to any motion to dismiss is due November 13, 2018. Signed by District Judge William M. Conley on 10/17/2018. (voc)
October 15, 2018 Filing 23 Notice of Appearance filed by Brandon Flugaur for Defendants Rebecca Blank, Board of Regents of the University of Wisconsin System, Lauren Hasselbacher, Cathy Trueba. (Flugaur, Brandon)
October 15, 2018 Filing 22 Notice of Appearance filed by Anne Maryse Bensky for Defendants Rebecca Blank, Board of Regents of the University of Wisconsin System, Lauren Hasselbacher, Cathy Trueba. (Bensky, Anne)
October 12, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ** TEXT ONLY ORDER ** The court will hold a telephonic conference to establish a briefing schedule on plaintiff's motion for preliminary injunction (dkt. #2 ) on Wednesday, October 17, 2018, at 1:00 p.m. Plaintiff is responsible for providing defendants' counsel with actual notice of this order. Plaintiff also is responsible for setting up the call to Chambers at 608-264-5087. Telephone Status Conference set for 10/17/2018 at 01:00 PM before Judge William M. Conley. Signed by District Judge William M. Conley on 10/12/2018. (voc)
October 11, 2018 Filing 20 Summons Returned Executed. Rebecca Blank served on 10/11/2018, answer due 11/1/2018. (Flanner, Mary)
October 11, 2018 Filing 19 Summons Returned Executed. Cathy Trueba served on 10/11/2018, answer due 11/1/2018. (Flanner, Mary)
October 11, 2018 Filing 18 Summons Returned Executed. Lauren Hasselbacher served on 10/11/2018, answer due 11/1/2018. (Flanner, Mary)
October 11, 2018 Filing 17 Summons Returned Executed. Board of Regents of the University of Wisconsin System served on 10/11/2018, answer due 11/1/2018. (Flanner, Mary)
October 10, 2018 Filing 16 Proposed Findings of Fact filed by Plaintiff Quintez Cephus re: #2 Motion for Preliminary Injunction. (Miltenberg, Andrew)
October 10, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ** TEXT ONLY ORDER ** The court is in receipt of plaintiff Quintez Cephus's motion for preliminary injunction. (Dkt. #2 .) Plaintiff is directed to promptly serve defendants with the summons and complaint, the motion for preliminary injunction, all supporting materials and this order. Once proof of such service has been filed, the court will schedule a telephonic conference to determine a briefing schedule on plaintiff's motion and set a hearing date. The court also notes that plaintiff has not filed a statement of proposed facts, as required by this court's procedure to be followed on motions for injunctive relief, which is available at # https://www.wiwd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/Injunctive_Relief.pdf. Accordingly, plaintiff is further directed to file such a statement on or before October 12, 2018. Once filed, if defendants have yet to enter their appearance, plaintiff also is directed to serve his statement of proposed facts. Signed by District Judge William M. Conley on 10/10/2018. (jls)
October 10, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ** TEXT ONLY ORDER **ORDER granting #9 Motion to Admit Tara Jill Davis Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Magistrate Judge Peter A. Oppeneer on 10/10/2018. (lak)
October 10, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ** TEXT ONLY ORDER **ORDER granting #8 Motion to Admit Stuart Bernstein Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Magistrate Judge Peter A. Oppeneer on 10/10/2018. (lak)
October 10, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ** TEXT ONLY ORDER **ORDER granting #6 Motion to Admit Andrew Todd Miltenberg Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Magistrate Judge Peter A. Oppeneer on 10/10/2018. (lak)
October 9, 2018 Filing 11 Exhibit to #7 Affidavit filed by Quintez Cephus. Exhibit A - Letter dated August 23, 2018, (Attachments: #1 Exhibit B - Letter dated August 30, 2018.) (Miltenberg, Andrew) Modified on 10/10/2018: Detailed e-mail sent to counsel. (lak)
October 9, 2018 Filing 10 Summons Issued as to Rebecca Blank, Board of Regents of the University of Wisconsin System, Lauren Hasselbacher, Cathy Trueba. (Attachments: #1 Summons Lauren Hasselbacher, #2 Summons Cathy Trueba, #3 Summons Rebecca Blank) (voc)
October 9, 2018 Filing 9 Motion to Admit Tara Jill Davis Pro Hac Vice. ( Pro Hac Vice fee $ 100 receipt number 0758-2334477.) by Plaintiff Quintez Cephus. Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker. (Davis, Tara)
October 9, 2018 Standard attachments for Judge William M. Conley required to be served on all parties with summons or waiver of service: # NORTC, #Corporate Disclosure Statement. (voc)
October 9, 2018 Case randomly assigned to District Judge William M. Conley and Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker. (voc)
October 9, 2018 Filing 8 Motion to Admit Stuart Bernstein Pro Hac Vice. ( Pro Hac Vice fee $ 100 receipt number 0758-2334457.) by Plaintiff Quintez Cephus. (Bernstein, Stuart)
October 9, 2018 Filing 7 Affidavit of Quintez Cephus filed by Plaintiff Quintez Cephus in Support re: #2 Motion for Preliminary Injunction (Flanner, Mary)
October 9, 2018 Filing 6 Motion to Admit Andrew Todd Miltenberg Pro Hac Vice. ( Pro Hac Vice fee $ 100 receipt number 0758-2334421.) by Plaintiff Quintez Cephus. (Miltenberg, Andrew)
October 9, 2018 Filing 5 Declaration of Andrew T. Miltenberg, Esq. filed by Plaintiff Quintez Cephus in Support re: #2 Motion for Preliminary Injunction. (Flanner, Mary)
October 9, 2018 Filing 4 Declaration of Stephen J. Meyer, Esq. filed by Plaintiff Quintez Cephus in Support re: #2 Motion for Preliminary Injunction. (Flanner, Mary)
October 9, 2018 Filing 3 Brief in Support of #2 Motion for Preliminary Injunction and Request for Expedited Consideration by Plaintiff Quintez Cephus. (Flanner, Mary)
October 9, 2018 Filing 2 MOTION FOR PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION and Request for Expedited Consideration by Plaintiff Quintez Cephus. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order) (Flanner, Mary)
October 9, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Rebecca Blank, Board of Regents of the University of Wisconsin System, Lauren Hasselbacher, Cathy Trueba, ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0758-2334388.), filed by Quintez Cephus, (Attachments: #1 JS-44 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons - Board of Regents of the University of Wisconsin System, #3 Summons - Lauren Hasselbacher, #4 Summons - Cathy Trueba, #5 Summons - Rebecca Blank) (Flanner, Mary)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Wisconsin Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Cephus, Quintez v. Board of Regents of the University of Wisconsin System et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cathy Trueba
Represented By: Anne Maryse Bensky
Represented By: Brandon Flugaur
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rebecca Blank
Represented By: Anne Maryse Bensky
Represented By: Brandon Flugaur
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lauren Hasselbacher
Represented By: Anne Maryse Bensky
Represented By: Brandon Flugaur
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Board of Regents of the University of Wisconsin System
Represented By: Anne Maryse Bensky
Represented By: Brandon Flugaur
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Quintez Cephus
Represented By: Andrew Todd Miltenberg
Represented By: Tara Jill Davis
Represented By: Mary C. Flanner
Represented By: Nola Hitchcock Cross
Represented By: Stuart Bernstein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?