Menard, Inc. v. Textron Aviation, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Menard, Inc.
Defendant: Pratt & Whitney Canada International, Inc., Dallas Airmotive, Inc. and Textron Aviation, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2018cv00844
Filed: October 12, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Wisconsin
Presiding Judge: William M Conley
Referring Judge: Stephen L Crocker
Nature of Suit: Prop. Damage Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 10, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 10, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 18 Pretrial Conference Order - # Preliminary Pretrial Packet in cases assigned to District Judge William M. Conley attached. Dispositive Motions due 11/1/2019. Settlement Letters due 2/28/2020. Motions in Limine due 3/6/2020. Response to Motion due 3/20/2020. Final Pretrial Conference set for 4/7/2020 at 04:00 PM. Jury Selection and Trial set for 4/20/2020 at 09:00 AM. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker on 12/10/2018. (jls)
December 7, 2018 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker: Telephone Preliminary Pretrial Conference held on 12/7/2018 [:15] (cak)
December 5, 2018 Filing 17 Notice of Appearance filed by Raymond Luke Mariani for Defendant Dallas Airmotive, Inc. (Mariani, Raymond)
December 4, 2018 Filing 16 Joint Preliminary Pretrial Conference Report by Plaintiff Menard, Inc. (White, Glenn)
November 26, 2018 Filing 15 Notice of Appearance filed by Michael Quinn Tidey for Plaintiff Menard, Inc. (Tidey, Michael)
November 19, 2018 Filing 14 Brief in Reply by Defendant Dallas Airmotive, Inc. in Support of #4 Motion to Dismiss. (Trevino, Joseph)
November 16, 2018 Case randomly reassigned to District Judge William M. Conley and Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker. (lak)
November 9, 2018 Filing 13 Exhibit List re: #12 Affidavit of Mark A. Hanson by Plaintiff Menard, Inc. (White, Glenn) Modified on 11/12/2018. (lak)
November 9, 2018 Filing 12 Affidavit of Mark A. Hanson filed by Plaintiff Menard, Inc. re: #4 Motion to Dismiss, (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Dallas Airmotive 2013 Engine Overhaul Estimate/Proposal, #2 Exhibit 2 - Dallas Airmotive/Menards 2013 Engine Lease Agreements, #3 Exhibit 3 - Dallas Airmotive 2011 Updated Estimate, #4 Exhibit 4 - Dallas Airmotive 2013 Updated Estimate, #5 Exhibit 5 - Textron 2011 Engine Overhaul Invoice, #6 Exhibit 6 - Textron 2013 Engine Overhaul Invoices, #7 Exhibit 7 - Dallas Airmotive 2008 Engine Repair Invoices) (White, Glenn) Modified on 11/12/2018. (lak)
November 9, 2018 Filing 11 Brief in Opposition by Plaintiff Menard, Inc. re: #4 Motion to Dismiss, filed by Dallas Airmotive, Inc. (White, Glenn)
November 9, 2018 Set Telephone Conference: Telephone Pretrial Conference set for 12/7/2018 at 01:00 PM before Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker. Counsel for Plaintiff responsible for setting up the call to chambers at (608) 264-5153. [#Standing Order Governing Preliminary Pretrial Conference attached] (jat)
November 9, 2018 Filing 10 ANSWER with Jury Demand by Defendant Pratt & Whitney Canada International, Inc. (Spoerk, Jeffrey)
November 9, 2018 Filing 9 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Defendant Pratt & Whitney Canada International, Inc. (Spoerk, Jeffrey)
November 5, 2018 Action Requested: If you have not already provided your #Consent to Magistrate/Request for Reassignment form, please do so by 11/19/2018. (lak)
October 22, 2018 Filing 8 Notice of Appearance filed by Stacy Ann Alexejun for Defendant Pratt & Whitney Canada International, Inc. (Alexejun, Stacy)
October 19, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ** TEXT ONLY ORDER **ORDER granting #3 Stipulated Motion for Extension of Time to File Answer by Defendant Pratt & Whitney Canada International, Inc. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker on 10/17/2018. (arw)
October 19, 2018 Filing 6 ANSWER with Jury Demand by Defendant Textron Aviation, Inc. (Haws, Daniel)
October 19, 2018 Filing 5 Declaration of Jeff Turner filed by Defendant Dallas Airmotive, Inc. re: #4 Motion to Dismiss. (lak)
October 19, 2018 Filing 4 MOTION TO DISMISS For Lack of Personal Jurisdiction and Improper Venue and Brief in Support by Defendant Dallas Airmotive, Inc. Brief in Opposition due 11/9/2018. Brief in Reply due 11/19/2018. (Attachments: #1 Disregard. See #5 .) (Trevino, Joseph) Modified on 10/19/2018. (lak)
October 19, 2018 Filing 3 Stipulated Motion for Extension of Time to File Answer re: #1 Notice of Removal, by Defendant Pratt & Whitney Canada International, Inc. (Spoerk, Jeffrey)
October 12, 2018 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Defendant Dallas Airmotive, Inc. (Trevino, Joseph) Modified on 10/12/2018: Case number. (lak)
October 12, 2018 Standard attachments for Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker required to be served on all parties with summons or waiver of service: #Corporate Disclosure Statement, #Order Regarding Assignment of Cases, #Notice of Assignment to a Magistrate Judge and Consent/Request for Reassignment, #Order on Dispositive Motions. (jls)
October 12, 2018 Case randomly assigned to Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker. (jls)
October 12, 2018 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Eau Claire County, case number 18 CV 469, ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0758-2336918), filed by Dallas Airmotive, Inc., (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - State Court Documents) (Trevino, Joseph) Modified on 10/12/2018: Added exhibit description. Several pages of the exhibit are blank. (lak)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Wisconsin Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Menard, Inc. v. Textron Aviation, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pratt & Whitney Canada International, Inc.
Represented By: Jeffrey Kenneth Spoerk
Represented By: Stacy Ann Alexejun
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dallas Airmotive, Inc.
Represented By: Joseph P. Trevino
Represented By: Raymond Luke Mariani
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Textron Aviation, Inc.
Represented By: Daniel Allen Haws
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Menard, Inc.
Represented By: Glenn Richard White
Represented By: Michael Quinn Tidey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?