Scales, Jimmy et al v. Walker, Lindsay et al
Plaintiff: Jimmy L. Scales
Defendant: L. Alsum ODonovan, Lindsay Walker, Correctional Officer Easterson and Michael Dittmann
Undetermined: CCI Prison Facility and WCI Prison Facility
Case Number: 3:2018cv00866
Filed: October 23, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Wisconsin
Presiding Judge: Barbara B Crabb
Referring Judge: Stephen L Crocker
Nature of Suit: Prisoner (Prison Condition)
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 18, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 28, 2018 Filing 5 Warden PLRA Letter. (nln),(ps)
November 28, 2018 Motion for In Forma Pauperis Screening. (nln),(ps)
November 28, 2018 Partial Filing fee received: $38.31, receipt number 34690033285. (nln),(ps)
November 15, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER on ifp request: Plaintiff Jimmy L. Scales assessed an initial partial filing fee of $38.31 due 12/7/2018. Plaintiff's motion to use his release account funds to pay the $38.31 initial partial payment is GRANTED. Signed by Magistrate Judge Peter A. Oppeneer on 11/15/2018. (nln),(ps)
November 7, 2018 Filing 3 Prisoner Trust Fund Account Statement by Plaintiff Jimmy L. Scales (rks),(ps) (Additional attachment(s) added on 11/15/2018: #1 IPP Calculation) (nln).
November 7, 2018 Filing 2 Motion for Use of Release Account Funds by Plaintiff Jimmy L. Scales. (Attachments: #1 Envelope) (rks),(ps)
October 23, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Jimmy L. Scales. (Case randomly assigned to District Judge Barbara B. Crabb.) (Attachments: #1 Inmate complaint documents) (jef)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Wisconsin Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Scales, Jimmy et al v. Walker, Lindsay et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: L. Alsum ODonovan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lindsay Walker
Represented By: Wisconsin Department of Justice_1983 actions
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Correctional Officer Easterson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael Dittmann
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Undetermined: CCI Prison Facility
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Undetermined: WCI Prison Facility
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jimmy L. Scales
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?