Obriecht, Andrew v. Splinter, Christopher et al

Plaintiff: Andrew Obriecht
Defendant: Charles Teasdale, Craig Larson, Jason Zeeh, J. D. Lind, Christopher Splinter and Dave Ross
Case Number: 3:2018cv00877
Filed: October 25, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Wisconsin
Presiding Judge: Stephen L Crocker
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 23, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 17, 2018 Filing 16 Joint Report of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting, (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Appendix) (Keckhaver, Karla)
December 6, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER Referring Case to Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker. Signed by District Judge James D. Peterson on 12/4/2018. (Attachments: #1 Consent - Plaintiff, #2 Consent - Defendants) (lak)
December 4, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ** TEXT ONLY ORDER **ORDER granting #13 Motion for Extension of Time to File Reply Brief by Defendants Craig Larson, J.D. Lind, Dave Ross, Christopher Splinter, Charles Teasdale, Jason Zeeh. Brief in Reply in Support of #11 Motion to Dismiss due 1/14/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker on 12/4/2018. (arw)
December 3, 2018 Set Pretrial Conference: Telephone Pretrial Conference set for 1/8/2019 at 1:30 PM before Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker. Counsel for Plaintiff responsible for setting up the call to chambers at (608) 264-5153. #Standing Order Governing Preliminary Pretrial Conference attached. (arw)
December 3, 2018 Filing 13 Motion for Extension of Time to File Reply Brief in Support of Motion to Dismiss by Defendants Craig Larson, J. D. Lind, Dave Ross, Christopher Splinter, Charles Teasdale, Jason Zeeh. (Keckhaver, Karla)
December 3, 2018 Action Requested: If you have not already provided your #Consent to Magistrate/Request for Reassignment form, please do so by 12/21/2018. (lak)
November 30, 2018 Filing 12 Brief in Support of #11 Motion to Dismiss by Defendants Craig Larson, J. D. Lind, Dave Ross, Christopher Splinter, Charles Teasdale, Jason Zeeh. (Keckhaver, Karla)
November 30, 2018 Filing 11 MOTION TO DISMISS by Defendants Craig Larson, J. D. Lind, Dave Ross, Christopher Splinter, Charles Teasdale, Jason Zeeh. Brief in Opposition due 12/21/2018. Brief in Reply due 12/31/2018. (Keckhaver, Karla)
November 16, 2018 Filing 10 Notice of Appearance filed by Gabe Johnson - Karp for Defendants Craig Larson, J. D. Lind, Dave Ross, Christopher Splinter, Charles Teasdale, Jason Zeeh. (Johnson - Karp, Gabe)
November 14, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ** TEXT ONLY ORDER **ORDER granting #8 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. All Defendants answer due 11/30/2018. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker on 11/14/2018. (arw)
November 13, 2018 Filing 8 Stipulation for Extension of Time by Defendants Craig Larson, J. D. Lind, Dave Ross, Christopher Splinter, Charles Teasdale, Jason Zeeh, (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order) (Keckhaver, Karla) Modified on 11/14/2018. (lak)
November 13, 2018 Filing 7 Notice of Appearance filed by Karla Z. Keckhaver for Defendants Craig Larson, J. D. Lind, Dave Ross, Christopher Splinter, Charles Teasdale, Jason Zeeh. (Keckhaver, Karla)
October 29, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ** TEXT ONLY ORDER **The court is in receipt of the motion for preliminary injunction (dkt. #3 ) that plaintiff filed one day after filing his complaint. Plaintiff has failed to file a statement of proposed facts or supporting evidence in accordance with the court's procedure for injunctive relief, available at #http://www.wiwd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/Injunctive_Relief.pdf. Accordingly, the court will not set briefing or an evidentiary hearing on the motion, but plaintiff may file supplemental supporting documents that bring his motion into compliance with the court's procedure. If plaintiff chooses to perfect his motion for preliminary injunctive relief, then the deadline for consenting to Magistrate Judge Crocker or requesting reassignment is 21 days from the date of service on defendants. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker on 10/29/2018. (arw)
October 26, 2018 Filing 5 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Plaintiff Andrew Obriecht. (Sulton, William)
October 26, 2018 Filing 4 Brief in Support of #3 Motion for Preliminary Injunction by Plaintiff Andrew Obriecht. (Sulton, William)
October 26, 2018 Filing 3 MOTION FOR PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION by Plaintiff Andrew Obriecht. (Sulton, William)
October 26, 2018 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to Craig Larson, J. D. Lind, Dave Ross, Christopher Splinter, Charles Teasdale, Jason Zeeh. (jat)
October 26, 2018 Standard attachments for Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker required to be served on all parties with summons or waiver of service: #Corporate Disclosure Statement, #Order Regarding Assignment of Cases, #Notice of Assignment to a Magistrate Judge and Consent/Request for Reassignment, #Order on Dispositive Motions. (jat)
October 26, 2018 Case randomly assigned to Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker. (jat)
October 25, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants (Filing fee $400, receipt number 0758-2345344) filed by Andrew Obriecht. (Attachments: #1 JS-44 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons - Charles Teasdale, #3 Summons - Christopher Splinter, #4 Summons - Craig Larson, #5 Summons - J.D. Lind, #6 Summons - Jason Zeeh, #7 Summons - Dave Ross) (Sulton, William) Modified on 10/26/2018. (lak)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Wisconsin Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Obriecht, Andrew v. Splinter, Christopher et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Charles Teasdale
Represented By: Gabe Johnson - Karp
Represented By: Karla Z. Keckhaver
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Craig Larson
Represented By: Gabe Johnson - Karp
Represented By: Karla Z. Keckhaver
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jason Zeeh
Represented By: Gabe Johnson - Karp
Represented By: Karla Z. Keckhaver
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: J. D. Lind
Represented By: Gabe Johnson - Karp
Represented By: Karla Z. Keckhaver
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Christopher Splinter
Represented By: Gabe Johnson - Karp
Represented By: Karla Z. Keckhaver
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dave Ross
Represented By: Gabe Johnson - Karp
Represented By: Karla Z. Keckhaver
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Andrew Obriecht
Represented By: William Francis Sulton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?