Mohamud, Omar v. Department of Employee Trust Fund of the State of Wisconsin

Plaintiff: Omar A. Mohamud
Defendant: Department of Employee Trust Fund of the State of Wisconsin
Case Number: 3:2018cv00880
Filed: October 26, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Wisconsin
Presiding Judge: Stephen L Crocker
Referring Judge: James D Peterson
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 6, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 26, 2018 Filing 3 Proposed Amended Complaint by Plaintiff Omar A. Mohamud. (rks),(ps)
November 6, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER that plaintiff Omar Mohamud may have until November 27, 2018, to submit an amended complaint. Signed by District Judge James D. Peterson on 11/6/2018. (jef),(ps)
October 26, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Department of Employee Trust Fund of the State of Wisconsin. (Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 34690033092), filed by Omar A. Mohamud. (Case randomly assigned to District Judge James D. Peterson.) (Attachments: #1 Subpoena, #2 address for Dept. of Employee Trust Fund, #3 Check) (jef)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Wisconsin Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Mohamud, Omar v. Department of Employee Trust Fund of the State of Wisconsin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Department of Employee Trust Fund of the State of Wisconsin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Omar A. Mohamud
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?