Anuwave LLC v. Alliant Energy Corporation

Plaintiff: Anuwave LLC
Defendant: Alliant Energy Corporation
Case Number: 3:2018cv00887
Filed: October 29, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Wisconsin
0 Judge: Stephen L Crocker
1 Judge: James D Peterson
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 35:271
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 19, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 19, 2018 Filing 10 Notice of Change of Address by Michelle Marie Umberger. (Umberger, Michelle)
December 4, 2018 Filing 9 Affidavit of Service by Plaintiff. Alliant Energy Corporation served on 11/7/2018, answer due 1/14/2019. (Torres, Eugenio)
November 26, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ** TEXT ONLY ORDER **ORDER granting #7 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Alliant Energy Corporation answer due 1/14/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker on 11/26/2018. (arw)
November 26, 2018 Filing 7 Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to File Answer re: #1 Complaint, or Otherwise Respond to Complaint by Defendant Alliant Energy Corporation. Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker. (Umberger, Michelle)
November 26, 2018 Filing 6 Notice of Appearance filed by Michelle Marie Umberger for Defendant Alliant Energy Corporation. (Umberger, Michelle)
October 31, 2018 Filing 5 Report on Filing of Patent or Trademark Action. Copy provided to the US Patent and Trademark Office electronically. (arw)
October 31, 2018 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Alliant Energy Corporation. (arw)
October 31, 2018 Standard attachments for District Judge James D. Peterson required to be served on all parties with summons or waiver of service: # NORTC, #Corporate Disclosure Statement. (arw)
October 31, 2018 Case randomly assigned to District Judge James D. Peterson and Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker. (arw)
October 30, 2018 Filing 3 Notice of Appearance filed by Jean G. Vidal for Plaintiff Anuwave LLC. (Vidal, Jean)
October 30, 2018 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Plaintiff Anuwave LLC. (Torres, Eugenio)
October 29, 2018 Filing 1 PATENT COMPLAINT against Alliant Energy Corporation (Filing fee $400, receipt number 0758-2347189) filed by Anuwave LLC. PATENTS AT ISSUE: Patent # 8295862, issued 10/23/12, held by Anuwave LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 2 - Patent 8295862, #2 JS-44 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Summons, #4 Report on Filing Patent/Trademark Action) (Torres, Eugenio) Modified on 10/31/2018. (arw)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Wisconsin Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Anuwave LLC v. Alliant Energy Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alliant Energy Corporation
Represented By: Michelle Marie Umberger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Anuwave LLC
Represented By: Eugenio J. Torres
Represented By: Jean G. Vidal
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?