Vanatta v. Litscher et al
Plaintiff: Damen Neil Vanatta
Defendant: Dr. Charles Larson, L. Bartow, Jon E. Litscher, Terry Kiser, Steven L Sisbach, Candace Whitman, Chris Krueger, David Borkhahn, Randall R. Hepp, Steve Bethke, William Weisensel, Julie Ludwig, John Maggioncalda, John and Jane Does Numbers 1 Through 10, J. Labelle, Randy Mattison and Pete Gallum
Case Number: 3:2018cv00901
Filed: November 1, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Wisconsin
Presiding Judge: Stephen L Crocker
Referring Judge: James D Peterson
Nature of Suit: Prisoner (Prison Condition)
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 7, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 11, 2018 Filing 15 Notice of Appearance filed by Laure C. Rakvic-Farr for Defendants L. Bartow, David Borkhahn, Pete Gallum, Randall R. Hepp, Charles Larson, Julie Ludwig, John Maggioncalda, Randy Mattison, Steven L Sisbach, Candace Whitman. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service) (Rakvic-Farr, Laure),(ps)
December 11, 2018 Filing 14 Amended Acceptance of Service by DOJ on behalf of Defendants L. Bartow, David Borkhahn, Pete Gallum, Randall R. Hepp, Charles Larson, Julie Ludwig, John Maggioncalda, Randy Mattison, Steven L Sisbach, Candace Whitman. (Flugaur, Brandon),(ps)
December 11, 2018 Filing 13 Notice of Appearance filed by Brandon Flugaur for Defendants L. Bartow, David Borkhahn, Pete Gallum, Randall R. Hepp, Charles Larson, Julie Ludwig, John Maggioncalda, Randy Mattison, Steven L Sisbach, Candace Whitman. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service) (Flugaur, Brandon),(ps)
November 2, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ** TEXT ONLY ORDER ** Pursuant to an informal service agreement between the Wisconsin Department of Justice and this court, copies of plaintiff's complaint, the October 19, 2018 screening order, and this text only order are being sent today to the Attorney General for service on defendants. Under the agreement, the Department of Justice will have 60 days from the date of the Notice of Electronic Filing of this order to answer or otherwise plead to plaintiff's complaint if it accepts service for defendants. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker on 11/2/2018. (jef),(ps)
November 1, 2018 Case non-randomly assigned to District Judge James D. Peterson. (jef),(ps)
November 1, 2018 Filing 11 Case transferred in from District of Wisconsin Eastern; Case Number 2:18-cv-00929. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received. (lak)
November 1, 2018 Case Terminated. (lz) [Transferred from Wisconsin Eastern on 11/1/2018.]
November 1, 2018 Case Electronically Transmitted to the Western District of Wisconsin on 11/1/2018. (lz) [Transferred from Wisconsin Eastern on 11/1/2018.]
November 1, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge William E Duffin on 11/1/2018 GRANTING #9 Plaintiff Damen Neil Vanatta's Motion to Transfer Case to Western District of Wisconsin. Vanatta also asks about consolidating his case with case number 16-cv-406, currently pending in the Western District and about having the attorney in that case represent him. He will need to raise those issues with the judge handling his case once it is transferred. (cc: all counsel - via US Mail to Plaintiff) (lz) [Transferred from Wisconsin Eastern on 11/1/2018.]
October 29, 2018 Filing 9 MOTION to Transfer Case to W.D. of Wisconsin by Damen Neil Vanatta. (mlm) [Transferred from Wisconsin Eastern on 11/1/2018.]
October 19, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 8 SCREENING ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge William E Duffin on 10/19/2018, granting #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed Without Prepayment of the Filing Fee. The court ORDERS that defendants William Weisensel, Terry Kiser, Jon E.Litscher, Chris Kruger, Steve Bethke, J. LaBelle, and John and Jane Does 110 are DISMISSED. Under an informal service agreement, the court ORDERS the clerk's office to electronically send copies of Vanatta's complaint and this order to the Wisconsin Department of Justice for service on defendants Warden Randall R. Hepp, John Maggioncalda, Candace Whitman, Charles Larson, Steven L. Sisbach, David Borkham, Julie Ludwig, Randy Mattison, Pete Gallum, and L. Bartow. The court ORDERS that the defendants do not need to file an answer at this time. The court ORDERS that Vanatta has until October 31, 2018 to inform the court how he would like to proceed. (cc: all counsel, plaintiff, Warden) (mlm) [Transferred from Wisconsin Eastern on 11/1/2018.]
June 29, 2018 INITIAL PARTIAL FILING FEE Received: $19.57, receipt number MK4689-072586. ; the payment of all future filing fees will be maintained by the financial department (bx) [Transferred from Wisconsin Eastern on 11/1/2018.]
June 26, 2018 Filing 7 Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction Form filed by Damen Neil Vanatta. (mlm) [Transferred from Wisconsin Eastern on 11/1/2018.]
June 21, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge William E Duffin on 6/21/2018 that on or before 7/13/2018 plaintiff shall forward to the Clerk of Court the sum of $ 19.57 as an initial partial filing fee in this action. Upon payment the court will determine whether the action can continue to proceed in forma pauperis. If Plaintiff does not wish to pay the filing fee or if he wishes to dismiss this action to avoid potentially incurring a "strike" under 28 USC 1915(g), he must notify the court by filing a letter with the Clerk of Court on or before July 13, 2018. (cc: all counsel via US Mail to Plaintiff and Warden-Fox Lake Corr Inst)(lz) [Transferred from Wisconsin Eastern on 11/1/2018.]
June 21, 2018 Filing 5 LETTER from the clerk to Plaintiff re Consent/Refusal to Magistrate Judge William E Duffin requesting that the consent/refusal form be filed within 21 days. (lz) [Transferred from Wisconsin Eastern on 11/1/2018.]
June 21, 2018 Filing 4 Prisoner Trust Fund Account Statement (2 months) by Damen Neil Vanatta. (lz) [Transferred from Wisconsin Eastern on 11/1/2018.]
June 20, 2018 Filing 3 Prisoner Trust Fund Account Statement (4 months) by Damen Neil Vanatta. (lz) (Additional attachment(s) added on 6/21/2018: #1 Cover Letter) (lz). [Transferred from Wisconsin Eastern on 11/1/2018.]
June 20, 2018 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed Without Prepayment of the Filing Fee by Damen Neil Vanatta. (lz) [Transferred from Wisconsin Eastern on 11/1/2018.]
June 20, 2018 Filing 1 PRISONER COMPLAINT with Jury Demand filed against All Defendants by Damen Neil Vanatta. (Filing Fee NOT PAID $400) (lz) [Transferred from Wisconsin Eastern on 11/1/2018.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Wisconsin Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Vanatta v. Litscher et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dr. Charles Larson
Represented By: Laure C. Rakvic-Farr
Represented By: Brandon Flugaur
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: L. Bartow
Represented By: Laure C. Rakvic-Farr
Represented By: Brandon Flugaur
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jon E. Litscher
Represented By: Wisconsin Department of Justice_1983 actions
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Terry Kiser
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Steven L Sisbach
Represented By: Laure C. Rakvic-Farr
Represented By: Brandon Flugaur
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Candace Whitman
Represented By: Laure C. Rakvic-Farr
Represented By: Brandon Flugaur
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chris Krueger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David Borkhahn
Represented By: Laure C. Rakvic-Farr
Represented By: Brandon Flugaur
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Randall R. Hepp
Represented By: Laure C. Rakvic-Farr
Represented By: Brandon Flugaur
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Steve Bethke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: William Weisensel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Julie Ludwig
Represented By: Laure C. Rakvic-Farr
Represented By: Brandon Flugaur
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Maggioncalda
Represented By: Laure C. Rakvic-Farr
Represented By: Brandon Flugaur
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John and Jane Does Numbers 1 Through 10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: J. Labelle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Randy Mattison
Represented By: Laure C. Rakvic-Farr
Represented By: Brandon Flugaur
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pete Gallum
Represented By: Laure C. Rakvic-Farr
Represented By: Brandon Flugaur
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Damen Neil Vanatta
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?