Simon, Sarah v. Cooperative Educational Service Agency #5
Plaintiff: Sarah Simon
Defendant: Cooperative Educational Service Agency #5
Case Number: 3:2018cv00909
Filed: November 2, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Wisconsin
Presiding Judge: William M Conley
Referring Judge: Stephen L Crocker
Nature of Suit: Labor: Family and Medical Leave Act
Cause of Action: 29:2601
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 11, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 11, 2018 Set Telephone Pretrial Conference: Telephone Pretrial Conference set for 1/16/2019 at 1:00 PM before Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker. Counsel for Plaintiff responsible for setting up the call to chambers at (608) 264-5153. [#Standing Order Governing Preliminary Pretrial Conference attached] (kwf)
December 10, 2018 Filing 7 ANSWER by Defendant Cooperative Educational Service Agency #5. (Stadler, Ronald)
December 6, 2018 Filing 6 Summons Returned Executed. Cooperative Educational Service Agency #5 served on 11/20/2018, answer due 12/11/2018. (Kuklinski, Amanda)
November 21, 2018 Filing 5 Notice of Appearance filed by Jonathan Edward Sacks for Defendant Cooperative Educational Service Agency #5. (Sacks, Jonathan) Modified on 11/21/2018. (lak)
November 21, 2018 Filing 4 Notice of Appearance filed by Ronald S. Stadler for Defendant Cooperative Educational Service Agency #5. (Stadler, Ronald) Modified on 11/21/2018. (lak)
November 21, 2018 Filing 3 Disregard. Modified on 11/21/2018. (lak)
November 5, 2018 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to Cooperative Educational Service Agency #5. (kwf)
November 5, 2018 Standard attachments for District Judge William M. Conley required to be served on all parties with summons or waiver of service: # NORTC, #Corporate Disclosure Statement. (kwf)
November 5, 2018 Case randomly assigned to District Judge William M. Conley and Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker. (kwf)
November 2, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Cooperative Educational Service Agency #5, ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0758-2352377.), filed by Sarah Simon, (Attachments: #1 Summons - Cooperative Educational Service Agency #5, #2 JS-44 Civil Cover Sheet) (Kuklinski, Amanda)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Wisconsin Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Simon, Sarah v. Cooperative Educational Service Agency #5
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cooperative Educational Service Agency #5
Represented By: Ronald S. Stadler
Represented By: Jonathan Edward Sacks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sarah Simon
Represented By: Amanda Michelle Kuklinski
Represented By: Aaron N. Halstead
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?