Karnes, Delinda et al v. CR Bard, Inc.
Plaintiff: Randy Karnes and Delinda Karnes
Defendant: CR Bard, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2018cv00931
Filed: November 9, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Wisconsin
Presiding Judge: William M Conley
Referring Judge: Stephen L Crocker
Nature of Suit: Personal Injury: Health Care/Pharmaceutical Personal Injury Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 16, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 14, 2018 Set Telephone Pretrial Conference: Telephone Pretrial Conference set for 1/29/2019 at 01:00 PM before Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker. Counsel for Plaintiff responsible for setting up the call to chambers at (608) 264-5153. [#Standing Order Governing Preliminary Pretrial Conference attached] (voc)
December 12, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ** TEXT ONLY ORDER **ORDER granting #4 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. CR Bard, Inc. answer due 1/11/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker on 12/12/2018. (voc)
December 12, 2018 Filing 4 Stipulated Motion for Extension of Time to File Answer re: #1 Complaint, by Defendant CR Bard, Inc. Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker. Response due 12/19/2018. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order) (Andras, Tiffany)
December 12, 2018 Filing 3 Notice of Appearance filed by Tiffany Marie Andras for Defendant CR Bard, Inc. (Andras, Tiffany)
November 14, 2018 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to CR Bard, Inc. (voc)
November 14, 2018 Standard attachments for Judge William M. Conley required to be served on all parties with summons or waiver of service: # NORTC, #Corporate Disclosure Statement. (voc)
November 14, 2018 Case randomly assigned to District Judge William M. Conley and Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker. (voc)
November 13, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against CR Bard, Inc., ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0758-2358306.), filed by Delinda Karnes, Randy Karnes, (Attachments: #1 JS-44 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons (Missing case number; already dated.)) (Dunken, Bert) Modified on 11/14/2018. (lak)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Wisconsin Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Karnes, Delinda et al v. CR Bard, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Randy Karnes
Represented By: Bert Tarrant Dunken, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Delinda Karnes
Represented By: Bert Tarrant Dunken, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CR Bard, Inc.
Represented By: Tiffany Marie Andras
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?