Emrit, Ronald v. Epic Medical Records

Plaintiff: Ronald Satish Emrit
Defendant: Epic Medical Records
Case Number: 3:2018cv00937
Filed: November 13, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Wisconsin
Office: Madison Office
Presiding Judge: William M Conley
Referring Judge: Stephen L Crocker
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 8, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 8, 2019 Filing 5 Summons filed by Ronald Satish Emrit. (Attachments: #1 Envelope) (rks),(ps)
November 19, 2018 Filing 4 Mail sent to Ronald Satish Emrit returned as undeliverable re #3 Order. No forwarding address provided. (nln),(ps)
November 13, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER on ifp request: Plaintiff Ronald Satish Emrit's motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis, dkt. #2 , is GRANTED. Complaint taken under advisement for screening. Signed by Magistrate Judge Peter A. Oppeneer on 11/13/2018. (nln),(ps)
November 13, 2018 Filing 2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Plaintiff Ronald Satish Emrit. (nln),(ps)
November 13, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Epic Medical Records, filed by Ronald Satish Emrit. (Case non-randomly assigned to District Judge William M. Conley.) (Attachments: #1 JS-44 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Envelope) (nln)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Wisconsin Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Emrit, Ronald v. Epic Medical Records
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Epic Medical Records
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ronald Satish Emrit
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?