Johnson, Darrick v. Weaver, Christopher et al

Plaintiff: Darrick T. Johnson
Defendant: Adam Perkins, City of Tomah and Christopher Weaver
Case Number: 3:2018cv00940
Filed: November 15, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Wisconsin
Presiding Judge: Stephen L Crocker
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 9, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER Referring Case to Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker. Signed by District Judge James D. Peterson on 1/9/2019. (Attachments: #1 Consent - Plaintiff, #2 Consent - Defendants) (lak)
January 3, 2019 Action Requested: If you have not already provided your #Consent to Magistrate/Request for Reassignment form, please do so by 1/23/2019. (kwf)
January 3, 2019 Set Telephone Pretrial Conference: Telephone Pretrial Conference set for 2/6/2019 at 1:00 PM before Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker. Counsel for Plaintiff responsible for setting up the call to chambers at (608) 264-5153. [#Standing Order Governing Preliminary Pretrial Conference attached] (kwf)
January 2, 2019 Filing 7 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Defendants City of Tomah, Adam Perkins, Christopher Weaver. (Lubinsky, Lori)
January 2, 2019 Filing 6 ANSWER by Defendants City of Tomah, Adam Perkins, Christopher Weaver. (Lubinsky, Lori)
January 2, 2019 Filing 5 Notice of Appearance filed by Lori Marie Lubinsky for Defendants City of Tomah, Adam Perkins, Christopher Weaver. (Lubinsky, Lori)
December 20, 2018 Filing 4 Notice of Appearance filed by Adam Paul Nero for Plaintiff Darrick T. Johnson. (Nero, Adam)
December 6, 2018 Filing 3 Waiver of Service Returned Executed by Defendants City of Tomah, Adam Perkins, Christopher Weaver. (Bradley, John)
November 16, 2018 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to Christopher Weaver. (Attachments: #1 Summons Issued as to Adam Perkins, #2 Summons Issued as to City of Tomah) (kwf)
November 16, 2018 Standard attachments for Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker required to be served on all parties with summons or waiver of service: #Corporate Disclosure Statement, #Order Regarding Assignment of Cases, #Notice of Assignment to a Magistrate Judge and Consent/Request for Reassignment, #Order on Dispositive Motions. (kwf)
November 16, 2018 Case randomly assigned to Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker. (kwf)
November 15, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants. Service to be completed by Waiver of Service of Summons. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0758-2359592.). Filed by Darrick T. Johnson, (Attachments: #1 JS-44 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons - Adam Perkins, #3 Summons - Christopher Weaver, #4 Summons - City of Tomah) (Bradley, John) Modified on 11/16/2018. (lak)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Wisconsin Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Johnson, Darrick v. Weaver, Christopher et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Adam Perkins
Represented By: Lori Marie Lubinsky
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City of Tomah
Represented By: Lori Marie Lubinsky
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Christopher Weaver
Represented By: Lori Marie Lubinsky
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Darrick T. Johnson
Represented By: John H. Bradley
Represented By: Adam Paul Nero
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?