Owen, Brenda v. Garland, Jeff et al

Plaintiff: Brenda Marcell Owen
Defendant: Jeff Garland, Jeffery Garbelman, Howard Gartland and Douglas M Soat
Case Number: 3:2018cv00951
Filed: November 19, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Wisconsin
Office: Madison Office
Presiding Judge: William M Conley
Referring Judge: Stephen L Crocker
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 14, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 14, 2019 Filing 7 Exhibits (Letters from State Collection Service and TransUnion) to #1 Complaint, filed by Brenda Marcell Owen. (Attachments: #1 Correspondence from TransUnion, #2 Envelope, #3 Envelope) (jef),(ps)
December 13, 2018 Filing 6 Exhibit to (1 in 3:18-cv-00951-wmc) (1 in 3:18-cv-01041-wmc) (1 in 3:18-cv-01040-wmc) (1 in 3:18-cv-00997-wmc) (1 in 3:18-cv-01013-wmc) (1 in 3:18-cv-00968-wmc) (1 in 3:18-cv-00999-wmc) (1 in 3:18-cv-01012-wmc) (1 in 3:18-cv-01000-wmc) (1 in 3:18-cv-00998-wmc) Complaints filed by Brenda Marcell Owen (Attachments: #1 Envelope) (rks),(ps)
December 4, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER on ifp request: Complaint taken under advisement for screening. Signed by Magistrate Judge Peter A. Oppeneer on 12/04/2018. (rks),(ps)
December 3, 2018 Filing 4 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Plaintiff Brenda Marcell Owen. (Attachments: #1 Application to Proceed in District Court Without Prepaying Fees or Costs (Short Form), #2 Cover Letter and Envelopes, #3 Envelope) (rks),(ps)
November 26, 2018 Filing 3 Disregard wrong case.
November 19, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER on ifp request: Plaintiff to submit $400 or Motion for IFP and Financial Affidavit due 12/12/2018. Signed by Magistrate Judge Peter A. Oppeneer on 11/19/2018. (rks),(ps)
November 19, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendant, filed by Brenda Marcell Owen. (Case non-randomly assigned to District Judge William M. Conley.) (Attachments: #1 Envelope) (rks)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Wisconsin Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Owen, Brenda v. Garland, Jeff et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jeff Garland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jeffery Garbelman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Howard Gartland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Douglas M Soat
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brenda Marcell Owen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?