United States of America v. Heist, Jeffrey
Petitioner: United States of America
Respondent: Jeffrey P. Heist and Jeffrey Paul Heist, Sr.
Case Number: 3:2018cv00956
Filed: November 20, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Wisconsin
Presiding Judge: Stephen L Crocker
Referring Judge: James D Peterson
Nature of Suit: Taxes
Cause of Action: 26:7402
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 9, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 18, 2019 Filing 18 Notice by Counter Claimant Jeffrey Paul Heist, Sr Notice of Evidence of Service by US Mail. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service Evidence of Service by US Mail, #2 Certificate of Service Evidence of Delivery by US Mail) (Heist, Jeffrey),(ps)
January 18, 2019 Filing 17 Amended Counterclaim, Joinder of Party as Defendant, filed by Jeffrey Paul Heist, Sr. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Doc #6 Heist Affidavit) (Heist, Jeffrey),(ps) Modified on 1/18/2019 (nln).
January 17, 2019 Filing 16 Notice by Respondent Jeffrey Paul Heist, Sr Notice of Intent to Disregard Void Order. (Heist, Jeffrey),(ps)
January 17, 2019 Filing 15 Objection and Exception to #14 Order and Notice of Personal Liability, by Respondent Jeffrey Paul Heist, Sr. (Heist, Jeffrey),(ps) Modified on 1/17/2019 (nln).
January 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER TO ENFORCE IRS SUMMONS. Signed by District Judge James D. Peterson on 1/16/2019. (jef),(ps)
January 15, 2019 Filing 13 Proposed Order Enforcing Internal Revenue Service Summons, by Petitioner United States of America. (Humphrey, Richard),(ps) Modified on 1/15/2019 (nln).
January 15, 2019 Filing 12 Minute Entry for proceedings held before District Judge James D. Peterson: Show Cause Hearing held on 1/15/2019. (Court Reporter CS.) [:03] (nln),(ps)
January 14, 2019 Filing 11 Letter from Jeffrey Paul Heist dated 1/11/19 enclosing submission titled, Order to Establish Legal Identity. (Attachments: #1 Submission titled, Order to Establish Legal Identity, #2 Envelope) (nln),(ps)
January 11, 2019 Filing 10 Notice by Counter Claimant Jeffrey Paul Heist, Sr Notice of Law decreed for the case. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Law decreed for the case) (Heist, Jeffrey),(ps)
January 11, 2019 Filing 9 Notice of withdrawal of consent and non-appearance, by Respondent Jeffrey Paul Heist, Sr. (Heist, Jeffrey),(ps) Modified on 1/14/2019 (nln).
January 11, 2019 Reset Hearings: the time of the Order to Show Cause Hearing on 1/15/2019 in courtroom 260 is rescheduled from 10:00 AM to 01:00 PM to accommodate the court's calendar. (jef),(ps)
January 4, 2019 Filing 8 Affidavit of Jeffrey Paul Heist re #7 Counterclaim. (rks),(ps)
January 4, 2019 Filing 7 COUNTERCLAIM against United States of America, filed by Jeffrey P. Heist. (Attachments: #1 Summons) (rks),(ps)
January 4, 2019 Filing 6 Affidavit of Jeffrey Paul Heist filed by Respondent Jeffrey P. Heist re: #3 Order to Show Cause (rks),(ps)
January 4, 2019 Filing 5 Response re: #3 Order to Show Cause. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service) (rks),(ps)
December 6, 2018 Filing 4 Marshal Service Return Executed re: #1 Petition to Enforce IRS Summons, #2 Declaration, #3 Order to Show Cause. (jat)
November 21, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 3 Order to Show Cause Issued. Materials returned to government for service. Order to Show Cause Hearing set for 1/15/2019 at 08:30 AM. Signed by District Judge James D. Peterson on 11/21/18. (jat)
November 20, 2018 Standard attachments for Judge James D. Peterson required to be served on all parties with summons or waiver of service: # NORTC, #Corporate Disclosure Statement. (jat)
November 20, 2018 Case randomly assigned to District Judge James D. Peterson and Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker. (jat)
November 20, 2018 Filing 2 Declaration of Cheryl Mann filed by Petitioner United States of America re: #1 Petition to Enforce IRS Summons. (Humphrey, Richard)
November 20, 2018 Filing 1 Petition to Enforce IRS Summons, filed by United States of America, (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Placeholder for Declaration of Cheryl Mann, #2 Exhibit 2 - IRS Summons, #3 Exhibit 3 - July 24, 2018 Letter to Heist from IRS, #4 Exhibit 4 - July 30, 2018 letter from Heist to IRS, #5 Exhibit 5 - August 3, 2018 letter to Heist from IRS, #6 JS-44 Civil Cover Sheet, #7 Order to Show Cause) (Humphrey, Richard)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Wisconsin Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: United States of America v. Heist, Jeffrey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: United States of America
Represented By: Richard Davis Humphrey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Jeffrey P. Heist
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Jeffrey Paul Heist, Sr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?